SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SANFORD USD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA doing business as SANFORD BEMIDJI, NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANFORD BISMARCK doing business as SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK doing business as SANFORD ABERDEEN MEDICAL CENTER, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL and ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03433
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/21/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/21/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANFORD BISMARCK, SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1913. (Webster, Stephanie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANFORD BISMARCK, SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7876933) filed by THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK, SANFORD BISMARCK, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER, SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO, NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER FARGO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD MEDICAL CENTER doing business as SANFORD USD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD HEALTH OF NORTHERN MINNESOTA doing business as SANFORD BEMIDJI
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD BISMARCK doing business as SANFORD BISMARCK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD HEALTH NETWORK doing business as SANFORD ABERDEEN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?