HARVEY v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: DAVID HARVEY
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, JOHN C. LAW, CHAD F. WOLF, KIMBERLY C. KELLY, WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II, MARIK STRING and CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03475
Filed: November 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2021. (View Docket Entry #4 to view document). (eg)
December 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM PELHAM BARR served on 12/14/2020; KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II served on 12/11/2020; KIMBERLY C. KELLY served on 12/14/2020; JOHN C. LAW served on 12/14/2020; MIKE POMPEO served on 12/14/2020; MARIK STRING served on 12/14/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 12/11/2020; CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY served on 12/14/2020 (Goldstein, Joshua)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II, KIMBERLY C. KELLY, JOHN C. LAW, MIKE POMPEO, MARIK STRING, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER in civil cases before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 30, 2020. (lcdlf3)
November 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
November 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7890733) filed by DAVID HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARVEY v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY C. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PELHAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIK STRING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER ASHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HARVEY
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?