DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C. et al v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C. and GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION
Defendant: TROY OLSON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, RODNEY S. SCOTT, PAUL ENRIGUEZ, CHAD F. WOLF, SCOTT SPELLMON and MARK A. MORGAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv03478
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay: In light of #34 Consent Motion to Stay the Case, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is granted and this case is STAYED for sixty days, excepting production as required under this Courts 1/7/2021 Minute Order addressing Plaintiffs' FOIA claim. It is further ORDERED that, other than to respond to immediate physical dangers or to keep project sites secure, Defendants will provide at least 14 days notice to Plaintiffs and to the Court before any construction adjacent to Plaintiffs parcels. It is further ORDERED that Defendants will promptly advise Plaintiffs of construction necessary to address an immediate physical danger unless the risk of harm requires action without notice, in which case Defendants will promptly notice Plaintiffs after construction begins. It is further ORDERED that this stay will terminate upon Plaintiffs' motion in the event construction resumes adjacent to Plaintiffs' parcels. It is further ORDERED that the parties will file a status report to the Court regarding settlement negotiationson or before 3/29/2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/28/2021. (lccrc2)
January 27, 2021 Filing 34 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Stewart)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the President's #"Proclamation on the Termination Of Emergency With Respect To The Southern Border Of The United States And Redirection Of Funds Diverted To Border Wall Construction", the parties are hereby directed to me et and confer and to, by January 28, 2021, file a brief joint status report addressing the impact of the Proclamation on #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as well as any further construction activities. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/21/2021. (lccrc2)
January 12, 2021 Filing 33 SURREPLY to re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Third Decl. of Col. Gant)(Alexander, Tyler)
January 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/5/2021 (lsj)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that #31 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' FOIA claims is granted. Defendants' shall file any response/reply to Plaintiff's FOIA claims by 02/05/2021. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' are directed to produce the non-exempt portions of the requested contract as soon as practicable and, in any event, by 02/21/2021 (i.e. within 45 days). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/7/2021. (lccrc2)
January 6, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Stewart)
January 5, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) Modified event on 1/6/2021 (ztd).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants are hereby ordered to file a surreply by 1/14/2021 which addresses North American Butterfly Association v. Wolf, 977 F.3d 1244 (D.C. Cir. 2020) as well as the Declaration and Exhibit submitted along with #21 Plaintiffs' Reply. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/04/2021. (lccrc2)
December 28, 2020 Filing 30 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHAD F. WOLF served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2020. (Baker, Stewart) Modified served date on 12/29/2020 (eg).
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/5/2021. (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT SPELLMON served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RODNEY S. SCOTT served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TROY OLSON served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARK A. MORGAN served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PAUL ENRIGUEZ served on 12/7/2020 (Baker, Stewart)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Sage Goodwin, #2 Exhibit A to Second Declaration of Sage Goodwin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Stewart)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Enriquez, #2 Affidavit Second Declaration of Col. Antoinette R. Gant)(Alexander, Tyler)
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on December 7, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance:December 10, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2021.(Moreira, Lisa)
December 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/14/2020 and Replies due by 12/21/2020. (lsj)
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Hirsch on behalf of DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION (Hirsch, David)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at this morning's hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that #4 Plaintiffs' Request for Emergency Relief is DENIED and #9 Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule on the Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. The following deadlines shall apply: Defendants' response to #4 Plaintiffs' Request for a Preliminary Injunction is due by 12/14/2020; Plaintiffs' reply is due by 12/21/2020. The court will consider the need for a further hearing in this matter after all briefing is submitted. As represented by Government counsel during the hearing, the Government shall provide the Plaintiffs 14 days advance notice prior to any culvert-related construction activity across Guadalupe Creek and 10 days' advance notice of any blasting adjacent to Plaintiffs' property. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/7/2020. (lccrc2)
December 7, 2020 Minute Entry for video Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/7/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Motion #4 Emergency for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion DENIED for reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Hirsch. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/4/2020. (lccrc2)
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Hirsch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7913168. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Hirsch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Stewart)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Notice (Other), filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Baker, Stewart)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on #9 Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule and #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Relief at 12/07/2020 at 10:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Details for the videoconference will be sent separately. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2020. (lccrc2)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Supplement to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Briefing Schedule by PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF re #12 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colonel Antoinette R. Gant)(Alexander, Tyler) Modified text on 12/3/2020 (ztd).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. This case is hereby transferred to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/2/2020. (lctnm3)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO filed by PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF. (Alexander, Tyler)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Stewart) Modified docket event/text on 12/2/2020 (eg).
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
December 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/2/2020. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a telephonic status conference at 3:30 p.m. on December 2, 2020 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties shall be prepared to address Defendants' #6 Notice of Related Case. Dial-in information has been emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/2/2020. (lctnm3)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by PAUL ENRIGUEZ, MARK A. MORGAN, TROY OLSON, RODNEY S. SCOTT, SCOTT SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Tyler)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Notice of Related Case filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Baker, Stewart)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 ERRATA of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION #1 Complaint,, filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Stewart)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 19-CV-00408 (TNM); 20-CV-01230 (TNM). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Tyler)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler McVeigh Alexander on behalf of All Defendants (Alexander, Tyler)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Sage Goodwin, #4 Exhibits to Declaration of Sage Goodwin (Part 1), #5 Exhibits to Declaration of Sage Goodwin (Part 2), #6 Exhibits to Declaration of Sage Goodwin (Part 3), #7 Exhibits to Declaration of Sage Goodwin (Part 4), #8 Declaration of John Kruc, #9 Exhibits to Declaration of John Kruc)(Baker, Stewart)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION (Baker, Stewart)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C. (Baker, Stewart)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7893998) filed by DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C., GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons for Paul Enriguez, #5 Summons for Mark A. Morgan, #6 Summons for Troy Olson, #7 Summons for Rodney S. Scott, #8 Summons for Scott A. Spellmon, #9 Summons for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #10 Summons for the U.S. Attorney General, #11 Summons for U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #12 Summons for Chad F. Wolf)(Baker, Stewart) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2020) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C. et al v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAMOND A RANCH, WESTERN DIVISION, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stewart A. Baker
Represented By: David B. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE RANCH CORPORATION
Represented By: Stewart A. Baker
Represented By: David B. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY OLSON
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Andrew I. Warden
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY S. SCOTT
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL ENRIGUEZ
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT SPELLMON
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?