CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HOSPITAL DISTRICT doing business as WASHINGTON HOSPITAL, COUNTY OF KERN doing business as KERN MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, WILCOX MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOHNS REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN doing business as SAN JOAQUIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER - SAN PABLO, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER - CONCORD, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF MONTEREY doing business as NATIVIDAD MEDICAL CENTER, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as FRENCH HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, SAN MARTIN CAMPUS, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as CHANDLER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ESSENTIA HEALTH SAINT MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL, SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, ROSE DE LIMA CAMPUS, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ARROYO GRANDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANTA ROSA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, LTD. doing business as HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HEALTH CARE - VALLEYCARE, NORTHBAY VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC doing business as ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER - LOS ANGELES, PALOMAR HEALTH doing business as POMERADO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA SAN FRANCISCO MEDICAL CENTER, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES RENO LLC doing business as SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES doing business as CONTRA COSTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY GILBERT MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, SIENA CAMPUS, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as SAINT FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS doing business as STANFORD HEALTH CLINIC, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER doing business as PALOMAR HEALTH DOWNTOWN CAMPUS, ZUCKERBERG SAN FRANSISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL & TRUAMA CENTER - ACUTE formerly doing business as SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER OF STOCKTON, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. BERNARDINE MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA doing business as SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNARDINO, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as SIERRA NEVADA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO, CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH doing business as DELANO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER and MARSHALL MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03485
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/21/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/21/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/14/20. (DM)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, COUNTY OF KERN, COUNTY OF MONTEREY, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, DIGNITY HEALTH, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER - SAN PABLO, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, ESSENTIA HEALTH SAINT MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER - CONCORD, MARSHALL MEDICAL CENTER, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHBAY VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL, PALOMAR HEALTH, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER, PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, LTD., PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES RENO LLC, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, SANTA ROSA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE - VALLEYCARE, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HOSPITAL DISTRICT, WILCOX MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ZUCKERBERG SAN FRANSISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL & TRUAMA CENTER - ACUTE (Webster, Stephanie)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7897053) filed by DIGNITY HEALTH, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, EL CAMINO HOSPITAL, DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER - SAN PABLO, WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HOSPITAL DISTRICT, NORTHBAY VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL, CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH, PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES RENO LLC, ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE, PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN, WILCOX MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, MARSHALL MEDICAL CENTER, ZUCKERBERG SAN FRANSISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL & TRUAMA CENTER - ACUTE, NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER, PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL, SANTA ROSA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, COUNTY OF KERN, PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, LTD., COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA, STANFORD HEALTH CARE - VALLEYCARE, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, PALOMAR HEALTH, COUNTY OF MONTEREY, STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS, CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES, ESSENTIA HEALTH SAINT MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER - CONCORD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HOSPITAL DISTRICT doing business as WASHINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF KERN doing business as KERN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILCOX MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOHNS REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as GLENDALE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN doing business as SAN JOAQUIN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS MEDICAL CENTER - SAN PABLO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER - CONCORD
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL EUREKA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MONTEREY doing business as NATIVIDAD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSION HOSPITAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as FRENCH HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, SAN MARTIN CAMPUS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as CHANDLER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESSENTIA HEALTH SAINT MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHBAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as SALINAS VALLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as DOMINICAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CAMINO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, ROSE DE LIMA CAMPUS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ARROYO GRANDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA ROSA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, LTD. doing business as HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HEALTH CARE - VALLEYCARE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHBAY VACAVALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INNOVIS HEALTH, LLC doing business as ESSENTIA HEALTH FARGO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER - LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALOMAR HEALTH doing business as POMERADO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA doing business as UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA SAN FRANCISCO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES RENO LLC doing business as SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTRA COSTA HEALTH SERVICES doing business as CONTRA COSTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY GILBERT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, SIENA CAMPUS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF THE MONTEREY PENINSULA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as SAINT FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HOSPITAL & CLINICS doing business as STANFORD HEALTH CLINIC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALOMAR MEDICAL CENTER doing business as PALOMAR HEALTH DOWNTOWN CAMPUS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUCKERBERG SAN FRANSISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL & TRUAMA CENTER - ACUTE formerly doing business as SAN FRANCISCO GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER OF STOCKTON
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. BERNARDINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETALUMA VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA doing business as SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNARDINO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as SIERRA NEVADA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR HEALTH doing business as DELANO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUEEN OF THE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARSHALL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?