KORSAH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: JONATHAN KORSAH
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv03580
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on February 22, 2021 at 10 a.m., before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be sent to the parties. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/9/2021. (lctnm3)
December 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cirino, Paul)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/14/2020. (lctnm3)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00820. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the government's #13 Motion to Transfer Venue is hereby GRANTED. This matter shall be transferred to the District of Columbia (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/7/20. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Case transferred to District of Columbia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
December 2, 2020 Per LO chambers motions set for 12/4/2020 on the pleadings (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 Reply to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by The United States of America. (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Jonathan Korsah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnston, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM Via Zoom before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Officer Wood-Thomas, #2 Exhibit SF 95, #3 SF 95 Denial Letter, #4 Secret Service Policy, #5 Secret Service Manual)(Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by The United States of America. (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 Withdrawal of Motion by The United States of America re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Jonathan Korsah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Map, #2 Exhibit Map, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Johnston, John)[Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Jonathan Korsah against The United States of America, filed by Jonathan Korsah.(Johnston, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM Via Teleconference before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of The United States of America (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Wood-Thomas, #2 Exhibit SF 95, #3 Exhibit SF 95 Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit Secret Service Policy, #5 Exhibit Secret Service Manual)(Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by The United States of America. (Chan, Hugham) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Attorney General of the United States on 08/17/2020, filed by Jonathan Korsah. (Johnston, John) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States of America ( U.S. Attorney )and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint 2 Summons for US Attorney General Barr & US Attorney G. Zachary Terwilliger by Jonathan Korsah. (Johnston, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons, The filing user has been notified that document 2-1, 2-2, 2-3 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint KORSAH v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by Jonathan Korsah. (Attachments: #1Document filed in error and removed re Summons, #2 Document filed in error and removed re Summons, #3 Document filed in error and removed re Summons)(Johnston, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2020) (klau, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/23/2020) (klau, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/23/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 7/23/2020 (klau, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint KORSAH v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7310419.), filed by JONATHAN KORSAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 12/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KORSAH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN KORSAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?