COLEMAN v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LEQUESHA COLEMAN
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv03581
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/8/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/5/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/6/2021.) (ztd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to U.S. Marshall for service. (adh, ) Modified on 12/29/2020 (znmw).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER referring case to a Magistrate Judge. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/14/2020. (lcjdb2)
December 14, 2020 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management up to and excluding trial. (zmd)
December 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (adh, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall ssign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/14/20.(psu1)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN J. RUMER on behalf of LEQUESHA COLEMAN (adh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #2 CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LCvR 83.2(g) (adh, ).
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LEQUESHA COLEMAN (adh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #1 Signature Certificate) (adh, ).
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL filed by LEQUESHA COLEMAN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adh, )
December 9, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/9/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLEMAN v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEQUESHA COLEMAN
Represented By: CAROLYN J. RUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?