FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. META PLATFORMS, INC.
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Defendant: FACEBOOK INC. and META PLATFORMS, INC.
Petitioner: SNAP INC., PINTEREST, INC., MATCH GROUP, INC., TWITTER INC., LINKEDIN CORPORATION, ORACLE CORPORATION and SEQUOIA CAPITAL OPERATIONS. LLC
Respondent: TIKTOK INC., Alpha Exploration Co. Inc. and ALPHABET INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03590
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney David E. Owyang terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Expert Discovery by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to META PLATFORMS, INC.. Attorney Catalina Vergara terminated. (Vergara, Catalina)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SNAP INC.. Attorney Justina Sessions terminated. (Sessions, Justina)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #306 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Notice of withdrawal must be signed and filed by the withdrawing attorney and signed by the party/parties represented (LCvR 83.6(b). (ztth)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SNAP INC.. Attorney Justina Sessions terminated. (Karin, John); Modified on 6/27/2023 (ztth).
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to the Joint #305 Request for Extension of the Expert Discovery Schedule, the Court ORDERS that: 1) FTC Opening Reports shall be submitted by on July 24, 2023; 2) Meta Reports shall be submitted by October 3, 2023; 3) FTC Rebuttal Reports shall be submitted by December 5, 2023; and 4) Expert discovery will close by February 20, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2023. (lcjeb2)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given both sides' representations in an email to chambers that there are no further disputed issues regarding their #302 JSR, the Court ORDERS that the hearing set for June 8, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2023. (lcjeb2)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: FTC Opening Reports shall be submitted by on 7/24/2023. Reports shall be submitted by 10/3/2023. FTC Rebuttal Reports shall be submitted by 12/5/2023. Expert Discovery due by 2/20/2024. (nbn)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Joint Request for Extension to the Expert Discovery Schedule filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER: In regard to the parties' disputes set forth in their latest [302-1] Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The FTC's request for additional "ad load" deposition time is GRANTED IN PART; the Malhotra deposition shall be reopened for up to two hours; and the FTC shall pre-disclose its intended exhibits to make the deposition move more quickly and ensure that the witness is fully conversant with any specific tests or simulations; 2) As to RFP 132, Meta's proposal to produce the studies, the data they rely upon, and the presentation regarding a 4th study (unpublished) is ADOPTED, and the FTC's requests for (a) custodial searches and (b) all documents "relating" to the Stage 3 studies is DENIED; and 3) As to Meta's 30(b)(6) deposition of the FTC on market definition, its request for written supplementation as to Questions 1-3 is DENIED because the FTC's supplemental responses to the prior interrogatories concerning use of features/platforms are sufficient, and the questions ask about "contentions" that the FTC does not make and thus need not have "factual support." Meta's request for written supplementation on Questions 4-5 is GRANTED. The FTC shall serve such supplemented responses by July 6, 2023, with the caveat that such responses not cross-reference the expert reports (i.e., they must be "standalone" answers). Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/7/2023. (lcjeb2)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to a phone call to chambers, the Court ORDERS that the deadline for the parties' 2-page statements regarding the FTC's proposed extension of the expert discovery deadline be extended to June 8, 2023, at 10 a.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/7/2023. (lcjeb2)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: FTC's Supplemented Responses due by 7/6/2023 (lsj)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 JOINT APPENDIX re 5/31/2023 Joint Status Report - Exhibit Index by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to a phone call to chambers, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit 2-page statements regarding the FTC's proposed extension of the expert discovery deadline by June 7, 2023, at 3 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/6/2023. (lcjeb2)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit 2-page statements regarding the FTC's proposed extension of the expert discovery deadline by June 7, 2023, at 3 p.m. (nbn)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 03:00 PM via Zoom before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the undisputed proposals set forth in the parties' [302-1] JSR at pp. 37-39 are ADOPTED. The Court further ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a zoom hearing on the disputed issues on June 8, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/5/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #301 Status Report,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Joint Status Report, #2 Declaration of Mark Silvia, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit A, #23 Exhibit B, #24 Exhibit C, #25 Exhibit D, #26 Exhibit E, #27 Exhibit F, #28 Exhibit G)(Hansen, Mark)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Joint STATUS REPORT by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Silvia, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit A, #29 Exhibit B, #30 Exhibit C, #31 Exhibit D, #32 Exhibit E, #33 Exhibit F, #34 Exhibit G)(Hansen, Mark)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brunfeld on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Brunfeld, David)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by John Karin on behalf of SNAP INC. (Karin, John)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #298 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John I. Karin. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/24/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John I. Karin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-10089408. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SNAP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John I. Karin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Crauthers, Robin)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg, held on 5-15-2023. Page Numbers: 1 - 12. Date of Issuance: 5-16-2023. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2023.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given both sides' representations in a phone call to chambers that there are no pending discovery disputes with third parties, the Court ORDERS that the hearing set for May 17, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/16/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan D. Miller on behalf of ALPHABET INC. (Miller, Evan)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 5/15/2023 re #292 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory Nos. 16, 20, 21, 22, 23 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Court Reporter Liz Saint-Loth) (nbn)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/31/2023. (nbn)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that Meta's #292 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The FTC shall respond by May 31, 2023, to Interrogatory Nos. 20-21 as they relate to "additional innovation," "quality improvements," "consumer choice," and "lower levels of service on privacy and data protection." It shall respond to Interrogatory No. 23 by June 7, 2023. The FTC need not respond to Interrogatory No. 22, and both sides have agreed as to Interrogatory No. 16. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/15/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to a telephone call to chambers requesting an extension of time to submit briefs regarding third-party disputes as to Google, the Court ORDERS that the parties may have an extension until May 16, 2023, at 12:00 noon to brief any disputes as to Google only. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/15/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 5/16/2023. (nbn)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Final JSR on fact discovery due by 5/31/2023. (nbn)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing re: the latest #294 JSR, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall file their final JSR on fact discovery by May 31, 2023; 2) Expert reports shall be due on the last business day of every other month starting in July; 3) As to category I, the FTC and Meta shall agree on which specific documents that assert attorney-client privilege over non-child documents that lack an attorney shall be re-reviewed; 4) As to category II, the FTC and Meta shall agree on a refresh of certain narrowed search terms for Mr. Janardhan only from the time he became infrastructure head; 5) As to category III, Meta shall produce documents from the 2019 and 2022 audits and the other documents it proposed to produce; 6) As to category IV, the Court accepts Meta's proposal; 7) As to category V, the Court denies the FTC's request; 8) As to category VI, Meta shall produce deposition and hearing transcripts and exhibits thereto; 9) As to category VII, Meta shall produce actual blacklists, but not documents "sufficient to show"; 10) As to category VIII, Meta shall answer the interrogatory as it relates to public filings, not any actual presentation; 11) As to category IX, Meta need not answer the interrogatory; 12) As to category X, Meta need not answer the interrogatory; 13) As to category XI, Meta shall answer 23(a) and (j) and search for documents responsive to (c)-(f); and 14) As to category XII, if the parties have not resolved the matter, they shall submit their respective proposals by May 16, 2023, at 12:00 noon. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/10/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 5/10/2023. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (nbn)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 5/15/2023. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2023 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #291 Status Report (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Joint Status Report- Revised)(Hansen, Mark)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #292 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory Nos. 16, 20, 21, 22, 23 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- SEALED)(Hansen, Mark)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory Nos. 16, 20, 21, 22, 23 by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Meta Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A- Redacted, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Joint STATUS REPORT - Revised by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #289 Memorandum (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Musser, Susan)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MEMORANDUM re Order, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Musser, Susan)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Per the JSR, the Court ORDERS that: 1) A hearing regarding any discovery disputes between Meta and non-parties shall take place on May 17, 2023, at 3:00 p.m.; 2) Briefs regarding such disputes shall be limited to three pages and shall be due by May 15, 2023, at 12:00 noon; and 3) The Court will hold a hearing on May 15, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. regarding Meta's #292 Motion to Compel FTC Interrogatory Responses. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/9/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As the parties' latest #287 JSR is rather challenging to decipher, the Court ORDERS that they shall submit by 9:00 a.m. on May 9, 2023, a revised JSR organized as follows: The parties shall list each issue on which at least one party seeks a Court ruling, and for each such issue, the proponent shall give its reasons (limited to three pages) directly following which the opponent shall give its reasons (limited to three pages). At the end of the listing of the issues in dispute, each party may give a general overview of the status of discovery. In addition, the Court ORDERS that the three depositions sought to be taken beyond May 22, 2023, may be so taken. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/8/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2023 (lsj)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Memoranda due by 5/9/2023. (lsj)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to the parties' joint telephone call to chambers regarding a discovery dispute, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit simultaneous memoranda addressing the issue, not to exceed five pages, by May 9, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/5/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal Danielle Dudding Irvine on behalf of TIKTOK INC. (Irvine, Crystal Danielle)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/10/2023 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a Zoom hearing regarding their latest [287-1] JSR on May 10, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/2023. (lcjeb2)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #286 Status Report (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Joint Status Report [Corrected])(Hansen, Mark)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Joint STATUS REPORT [CORRECTED] by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #284 Status Report,,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Joint Status Report, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit 1, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19)(Hansen, Mark)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Joint STATUS REPORT by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit 1, #21 Exhibit 2, #22 Exhibit 3, #23 Exhibit 4, #24 Exhibit 5, #25 Exhibit 6, #26 Exhibit 7, #27 Exhibit 8, #28 Exhibit 9, #29 Exhibit 10, #30 Exhibit 11, #31 Exhibit 12, #32 Exhibit 13, #33 Exhibit 14, #34 Exhibit 15, #35 Exhibit 16, #36 Exhibit 17, #37 Exhibit 18, #38 Exhibit 19)(Hansen, Mark)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #283 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Crystal Danielle Dudding Irvine. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/1/2023. (lcjeb2)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Crystal Danielle Dudding Irvine, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10034906. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIKTOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Crystal Danielle Dudding Irvine, #2 Attachment to Irvine Declaration, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Irvine NY, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the FTC's #278 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/27/2023. (lcjeb2)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's #282 Order, the hearing on FTC's #278 Motion to Compel set for April 28, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/27/2023. (lcjeb2)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION re. #280 Order on #266 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/2023. (lcjeb4)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #266 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/2023. (lcjeb4)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear via Zoom for a hearing on the FTC's #278 Motion to Compel on April 28, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/25/2023. (lcjeb2)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #278 MOTION to Compel (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION to Compel by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D_Redacted, #5 Exhibit E_Redacted, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #276 Response to Order of the Court, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Meta Opposition Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hansen, Mark)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, re Discovery Disputes filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Simultaneous memoranda addressing both issues, not to exceed five pages due by 4/21/2023. (nbn)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In response to the parties' joint telephone call to chambers regarding two discovery disputes concerning Plaintiff's request for document production, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit simultaneous memoranda addressing both issues, not to exceed five pages, by April 21, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/18/2023. (lcjeb4)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #274 Reply to Document, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Nos. 10-12, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt, #9 Exhibit I)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REPLY re #271 Response to motion, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the #253 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/12/2023. (lcjeb2)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #271 Response to motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Meta Opposition to FTC Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 10, 11, 12)(Hansen, Mark)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 RESPONSE re #266 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 10,11, and 12 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by June Hee Im on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Im, June)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Ihnat on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Ihnat, Melissa)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by June Burton on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Burton, June)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #266 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 10,11, and 12 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 10,11, and 12 by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support _Redacted, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Loh on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Loh, Alicia)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the #243 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/29/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg held on 3/27/23; Page Numbers: 1-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Nestor, Telephone number 202-354-3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/18/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2023.(Nestor, Tammy)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held via Zoom on 3/27/2023. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (nbn)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The FTC shall file any Motion to Compel (limited to 15 pages) on Interrogatories 10-12 by March 31, 2023, with Meta's Opposition (limited to 15 pages) due by April 11, 2023, and the FTC's Reply (limited to 10 pages) due by April 17, 2023; 2) Meta shall search performance evaluations prepared by managers/supervisors of deponents using the search terms agreed on in the FTC's first RFP; and 3) By March 31, 2023, the FTC shall identify specific items on the Meta litigation log or randomly generate 1000 items on the log for Meta to review within two weeks of receipt. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/27/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Compel due by 3/31/2023. Responses due by 4/11/2023. Replies due by 4/17/2023. (nbn)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #261 Reply to opposition to Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Meta Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen- SEALED, #3 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPLY to opposition to motion re #259 Memorandum in Opposition,, Meta Platforms, Inc. Motion to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 2 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen- Redacted, #2 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #259 Memorandum in Opposition,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Memorandum in opposition to re #253 Motion to Compel, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Declaration of Patricia Galvan, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear to discuss the disputes set forth in their #257 JSR on March 27, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' #256 Notice of Withdrawal, the Court ORDERS that the hearing scheduled for March 23, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/21/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #257 Status Report, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Joint Status Report, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit P, #13 Exhibit Q)(Hansen, Mark)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Joint STATUS REPORT by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Hansen, Mark)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #246 MOTION to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents (Redacted) (Scheinkman, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to opposition to motion re #249 Memorandum in Opposition to Meta Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 13 and 14 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #253 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 2 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - SEALED, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen- SEALED, #3 Exhibit A- SEALED, #4 Exhibit F- SEALED, #5 Exhibit G- SEALED, #6 Exhibit H- SEALED, #7 Exhibit I- SEALED)(Hansen, Mark)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 2 by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Redacted, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen- Redacted, #3 Exhibit A- Redacted, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F- Redacted, #9 Exhibit G- Redacted, #10 Exhibit H- Redacted, #11 Exhibit I- Redacted, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel V. Dorris on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Dorris, Daniel)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a hearing to discuss Meta's #246 Motion to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents will be held on March 23, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/10/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 3/13/2023. Responses due by 3/22/2023. Replies due by 3/24/2023. (nbn)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, the Court ORDERS that they brief their discovery dispute regarding the FTC answering Meta's Interrogatory No. 2 as follows: 1) Meta shall file its opening brief of no more than 15 pages by March 13, 2023; 2) The FTC shall file its opposition of no more than 15 pages by March 22, 2023; and 3) Meta shall file its reply of no more than 5 pages by March 24, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/9/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Non-party The New York Times Company shall respond by 3/15/2023. (nbn)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE re #246 MOTION to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents (Redacted) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by March 13, 2023, any nonparty that Meta served with a deposition subpoena before February 21, 2023, shall confirm its availability on the noticed date or propose a reasonable alternative. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/8/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by March 15, 2023, non-party The New York Times Company shall respond with a brief of no more than three pages to Meta's #246 Motion to Compel. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/8/2023. (lcjeb2)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #249 Memorandum in Opposition (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Memorandum in opposition to re #243 Motion to Compel, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Statement Regarding Status of Nonparty Discovery filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #246 MOTION to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents (Redacted) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 SEALED Meta Motion to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents)(Scheinkman, Michael)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Compel Non-Party The New York Times Company to Produce Documents (Redacted) by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheinkman, Michael)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Statement Regarding Non-Party Disputes filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #243 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 13 and 14 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support -SEALED, #2 Exhibit A- SEALED)(Hansen, Mark)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 13 and 14 by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Redacted, #2 Exhibit A- Redacted, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All disputes with third parties shall be brought to the Court's attention by 3/3/2023. (nbn)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Raise Third Party Disputes by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Joint #242 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) All disputes with third parties shall be brought to the Court's attention by March 3, 2023, via three-page briefs. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/17/2023. (lcjeb2)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 2/9/23; Page Numbers: 1-30. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Nestor, Telephone number 2023543127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2023.(Nestor, Tammy)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held via Zoom video on 2/9/2023. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (nbn)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All disputes with third parties shall be brought to the Court's attention by 2/21/2023. (nbn)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' Stipulation and Order Regarding Remote Depositions, and the signed Order is attached. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/9/2023. (lcjeb2)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's discovery hearing, the Court ORDERS that as to the disputed issues raised by the FTC in ECF No. 236-1 at 2: 1) Investigatory hearing transcripts shall be treated the same as deposition transcripts provided that the current or former Meta employee was represented by Meta counsel during the IH; 2) ECF No. 227-1 shall be entered as a stipulated Order; 3) Meta shall provide documents that respond to Int. Nos. 8-9 or a narrative response by February 28, 2023; and 4) All disputes with third parties shall be brought to the Court's attention by February 21, 2023, via three-page briefs. As to the issue raised by Meta regarding its Int. Nos. 13-14, Meta shall file a motion to compel, 11 days after which the FTC shall file its opposition, and 5 days after which Meta shall file any reply. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/9/2023. (lcjeb2)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear via Zoom for a discovery hearing related to the most recent #236 Joint Status Report on February 9, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/1/2023. (lcjeb2)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2023. (nbn)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/9/2023 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lorber on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Lorber, Justin)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren Vitenson on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Vitenson, Oren)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B_ Redacted, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Matheson, Daniel)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report_Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A _ Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B_ Filed Under Seal)(Matheson, Daniel)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry A. Lange on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Lange, Perry)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT OF VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge James E. Boasberg held on January 5, 2023. Page Numbers: 1 - 24. Date of Issuance: January 23, 2023. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court repor ter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2023.(Hook, Jeff)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given both sides' representations that no disputes with third parties are currently ripe, the Court ORDERS that the discovery hearing set for January 26, 2023, is VACATED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2023. (lcjeb2)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #233 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Statement re Non-Party Disputes filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 1/30/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 1/27/2023 (zbaj).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Statement re Non-Party Disputes filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Pearson, III on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Pearson, Stephen)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #230 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke is terminated. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/10/2023. (lcjeb2)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Proposed Order by TWITTER INC.. (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Meta shall make best efforts to produce relevant and deponent-responsive documents before the scheduled depositions; 2) Meta shall certify that the documents produced in response to Interrogatory No. 4 fully respond to that Interrogatory; and 3) The FTC shall answer Interrogatory No. 15. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/5/2023. (lcjeb2)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg:Status Conference held on 1/5/2023. See Minute Order filed on 1/5/2023 for full details. (Court Reporter Jeff Hook) (nbn)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Goldsmith, Andrew)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. Status Conference set for 1/26/2023 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) Modified to correct second date on 12/20/2022 (nbn).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Mucchetti on behalf of TWITTER INC. (Mucchetti, Peter)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' #227 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall appear for a Zoom hearing on January 5, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. to resolve the identified disputes; and 2) A second hearing will be held on January 26, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. to resolve any disputes with third parties regarding discovery. Either side and any third party with an unresolved dispute shall file briefs of no more than three pages as to each dispute by January 20, 2023, at 5:00 p.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/19/2022. (lcjeb2)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 1/20/2023. Discovery Hearing set for 1/26/2023 at 2:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. Status Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 2:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (lsj)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Remote Depositions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Meta's First Set of Interrogatories to the FTC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Meta's Second Set of Interrogatories to the FTC)(Matheson, Daniel)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Ario Fazli on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Fazli, Ario)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Anusha Sunkara on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Sunkara, Anusha)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 12/9/2022. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's hearing in response to the parties' #223 , #224 briefs, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Unless compelling reasons to the contrary exist, FTC counsel may appear for depositions in person or remotely; and 2) The parties can work out between themselves the display of documents to deposition witnesses. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/9/2022. (lcjeb2)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, re: Discovery Dispute filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huff, Kevin)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, re: Discovery Dispute filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a discovery dispute hearing is set for Friday, December 9, 2022, at 11 a.m. via Zoom. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall each submit a pleading of no more than 3 pages by 12 p.m. on Thursday, December 8, 2022, explaining their respective positions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/7/2022. (lcjeb2)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frake on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Frake, Erin)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: the FTC shall provide Meta the 2500 entries by December 1, 2022; Meta shall re-review 1250 by December 30, 2022; and it shall review the other 1250 by January 31, 2023. (nbn)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 11/28/2022. (Court Reporter Tim Miller) (nbn)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that the FTC shall provide Meta the 2500 entries by December 1, 2022; Meta shall re-review 1250 by December 30, 2022; and it shall review the other 1250 by January 31, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/28/2022. (lcjeb2) Modified to correct year on 12/2/2022 (nbn).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, re Pending Discovery Issue filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Klineberg, Geoffrey)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 11/9/22; Page Numbers: 1-32. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Nestor, Telephone number 2023543127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2023.(Nestor, Tammy)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Joint STATUS REPORT with Snap Inc. by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 11/28/2022 at 04:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a discovery dispute hearing is set for Monday, November 28, 2022, at 4 p.m. via Zoom. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall each submit a pleading of no more than 3 pages by Wednesday, November 23, 2022, explaining their respective positions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/18/2022. (lcjeb2)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 11-10-22; Page Numbers: 1-6. Date of Issuance:11-14-22. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number 202-354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2023.(Griffith, Lisa)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 11/10/2022. #212 Motion to Quash; DENIED for reasons set forth on the record. Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith. (zcal)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 11/9/2022. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (nbn)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Meta shall have an extension through December 7, 2022, for document production, provided that it shall continue to produce responsive documents on a rolling basis in the interim; and 2) The FTC shall identify 600 additional hyperlinks for Meta to review and produce in 150-link tranches. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/9/2022. (lcjeb2)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Meta shall have an extension through December 7, 2022, for document production, provided that it shall continue to produce responsive documents on a rolling basis in the interim. (nbn)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Letters Rogatory Issued. (nbn)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #214 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Letters of Request filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2022. (nbn)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Joint #214 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request is GRANTED, and the signed Letters of Requests are attached. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2022. (lcjeb2) Modified on 11/9/2022 (nbn).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Joint MOTION for Discovery for Issuance of Letters of Request by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Letter of Request to Kakao for Documents, #3 TRANSLATED Letter of Request to Kakao for Documents, #4 Letter of Request to Kakao for Testimony, #5 TRANSLATED Letter of Request to Kakao for Testimony)(Hansen, Mark)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO NONPARTY SEQUOIA CAPITALS MOTION TO QUASH filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Issued by the Federal Trade Commission by SEQUOIA CAPITAL OPERATIONS. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Musallam, Samer)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 6/22/2022; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance:11/7/2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number 202-354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above . After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2023.(znbn)
November 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 2-28-2022; Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance:11-6-22. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number 202-354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2023.(Griffith, Lisa)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #208 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Collin R. White. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/4/2022. (lcjeb2)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Samer Makram Musallam on behalf of SEQUOIA CAPITAL OPERATIONS. LLC (Musallam, Samer)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Collin R. White, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9647328. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klineberg, Geoffrey)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 10-31-22; Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance:11-1-22. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number 202-354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023.(Griffith, Lisa)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing via Zoom on November 9, 2022, at 11 a.m. to discuss the issues raised in their #206 Joint Status Report. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a hearing to address Sequoia Capital's motion to quash FTC's subpoena is set for Thursday, November 10, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall each submit a pleading of no more than 3 pages by Monday, November 7, 2022, explaining their respective positions. Sequoia shall attach to its pleading a copy of the deposition notice. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/1/2022. (lcjeb2) Modified to amend name on 11/1/2022 (nbn).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. Status Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Matheson, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 10/31/2022. Minute Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Meta's #205 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and 2) The parties shall submit a joint status report by November 21, 2022, in which Meta shall list any specific document requests on which the parties cannot reach agreement, and Snap shall provide its response on what it is willing to search and produce. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/2022. (lcjeb2)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/21/2022. (nbn)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Snap to Produce Documents by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Pleading of Non-Party Snap in Opposition to Metas Motion to Compel filed by SNAP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Snaps Offer to Meta, #2 Appendix B - FTCs Priority Categories)(Sessions, Justina)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Njeri Mugure on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Mugure, Njeri)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a hearing to address Meta's motion to compel Snap Inc.'s responses to Meta's subpoena is set for Monday, October 31, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall each submit a pleading of no more than 3 pages by Thursday, October 27, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. explaining their respective positions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/19/2022. (lcjeb2) Modified to correct the time on 10/20/2022 (nbn).
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Sessions on behalf of SNAP INC. (Sessions, Justina)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Taylor on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Taylor, Peter)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 10/13/2022. (Court Reporter Jan Dickman) (nbn)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, STATEMENT OF NON-PARTY ALPHA EXPLORATION CO. INC. (CLUBHOUSE) IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL BY META PLATFORMS, INC. filed by Alpha Exploration Co. Inc.. (Jaffe, Jordan)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Gringer, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jordan R. Jaffe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9588636. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Alpha Exploration Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Margo, Benjamin)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a hearing to address Meta's motion to compel Alpha Exploration Co.'s responses to Meta's February 22, 2022 subpoena is set for Thursday, October 13, 2022 at 5:15 p.m. by Zoom. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a pleading of no more than 3 pages by Wednesday, October 12, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. explaining their respective positions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2022. (lcjeb2)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #198 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan R. Jaffe. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/2022. (lcjeb2)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/13/2022 at 05:15 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Margo on behalf of Alpha Exploration Co. Inc. (Margo, Benjamin)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 9/30/2022. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's discovery hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall now provide joint status reports on discovery every 45 days, as opposed to every three months, with the next one due on October 31, 2022; and 2) The parties shall use best efforts to ensure that this Court handles all third-party discovery disputes. This will streamline the litigation, avoid delays in other jurisdictions, offer predictability and consistency in discovery rulings, and help inform the Court on the relevant issues. As a result, where the FTC or Meta seeks the Court's intervention, it shall join the third party in a telephone call to chambers to set a hearing. Where a third party files a discovery motion in a different court, the FTC or Meta shall inform that court of this Order and seek transfer here. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/30/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2022. (nbn)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Supplemental MOTION Monthly Updates by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Klineberg, Geoffrey)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Meta shall produce: (i) the number of documents generated by each search string, and (ii) the total number of documents for each custodian that hit on the complete set of search terms due by 9/26/2022. (nbn)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re #190 : The Court ORDERS that by September 26, 2022, Meta shall produce: (i) the number of documents generated by each search string, and (ii) the total number of documents for each custodian that hit on the complete set of search terms. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/19/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPLY to opposition to motion 191 filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE re #190 Memorandum re Hit Count Reports filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Klineberg, #2 Exhibit A)(Klineberg, Geoffrey)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #190 Memorandum (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM re Order, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #188 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER DENYING #152 Motion to Compel. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that Defendant's Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Marie Farren on behalf of TIKTOK INC. (Farren, Angela)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Matthew Reiser on behalf of TIKTOK INC. (Reiser, Craig)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 9/7/2022. Responses due by 9/12/2022. Replies due by 9/14/2022. (nbn)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TIKTOK INC.. Attorney David P. Wales terminated. (Wales, David)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TIKTOK INC.. Attorney Steven C. Sunshine terminated. (Sunshine, Steven)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TIKTOK INC.. Attorney Julia K. York terminated. (York, Julia)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: To the extent that the parties have not resolved their dispute regarding "hit count reports" in the FTC's first RFP, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a brief of no more than 5 pages supporting its position by September 7, 2022, with Defendant's response of no more than 5 pages by September 12, 2022, and Plaintiff's reply of no more than 3 pages by September 14, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/2/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Keeley on behalf of TIKTOK INC. (Keeley, Michael)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Angela M. Farren, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9486221. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIKTOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela M. Farren, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Farren NY, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Craig M. Reiser, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9486198. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIKTOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig M. Reiser, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Reiser NY, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh on behalf of TIKTOK INC. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #181 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela M. Farren. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #180 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. Reiser. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Joint STATUS REPORT [CORRECTED] by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #175 MOTION for Discovery for Issuance of Discovery Orders and Letters Rogatory (Hansen, Mark)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 8/18/2022.....MOTION for Discovery for Issuance of Discovery Orders and Letters Rogatory by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A- TRANSLATED, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B- TRANSLATED, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit C- TRANSLATED, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit D- TRANSLATED)(Hansen, Mark); Modified on 8/19/2022 (ztth).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION Non-Party Tiktok's Inc.'s Motion to Deny Defendant's Designated In-House Counsels Access to Highly Confidential Information by TikTok Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Julia K. York, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Julia K. York, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Julia K. York, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Julia K. York, #6 Exhibit D - Declaration of Julia K. York, #7 Exhibit E - Declaration of Julia K. York)(Sunshine, Steven)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #174 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; emailed to steven.sunshine@skadden.com, cc'd 136 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Please do not refile. In future, the signature on the pleading must match login credentials. (ztth, )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Non-Party Tiktok's #174 Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court's #103 Scheduling Order describes how discovery disputes are handled. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/16/2022. (lcjeb3)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Wales on behalf of TikTok Inc. (Wales, David)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia K. York on behalf of TikTok Inc. (York, Julia)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Sunshine on behalf of TikTok Inc. (Sunshine, Steven)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 DECLARATION of Daniel Matheson by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re Order,,. (Matheson, Daniel)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Meta shall substantially complete its document production in response to the FTC's first set of requests by November 16, 2022, which is five months after it began its collection. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/10/2022. (lcjeb2)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As the Court may decide to review certain documents in camera, it ORDERS that by August 12, 2022, the FTC shall provide it with the following documents from the FTC's Privilege Log (ECF No. 160-8): 1 through 1(e), 2 through 2(g), 3, 4, 5(e). In addition, the FTC shall provide the following documents from the Log in both fully unredacted form and in the redacted form produced to Meta: 6 & 6(a), 7 & 7(a), 8 & 8(a), 9 & 9(a), 10 & 10(a), 11 & 11(a), 12 & 12(a), 13 & 13(a). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/9/2022. (lcjeb2)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #165 Order, filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. (Hansen, Mark) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 8/8/2022 (ztth).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Catalina Vergara on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Vergara, Catalina)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Catalina J. Vergara, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9408568. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catalina J. Vergara, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Kevin)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING #151 Motion to Compel. The Court ORDERS that: 1) By August 22, 2022, Meta shall submit to the FTC a list of each feature or activity available to users on Facebook, Instagram, WhatsApp, or Facebook Messenger that Meta wishes the FTC to categorize as included or excluded from the definition of "personal social networking"; 2) By September 12, 2022, the FTC shall inform Meta whether each such feature or activity is or is not within that definition; and 3) If, at any point in the future, the FTC takes a different position on any such feature or activity, the FTC shall so supplement its response. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2022. (lcjeb3)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #166 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catalina J. Vergara. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' #164 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that by August 5, 2022, Meta shall show cause why it cannot complete the relevant production by October 31, 2022, as opposed to November 30, 2022. The FTC shall offer any response by August 9, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 8/5/2022. (lsj)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY to opposition to motion re #152 MOTION to Compel Production of 2012 and 2014 FTC Memoranda filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen, #2 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark) (Attachment 2 flattened and replaced on 7/27/2022.) (ztnr)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #151 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(Hansen, Mark)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY to opposition to motion re #151 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Memorandum in opposition to re #152 MOTION to Compel Production of 2012 and 2014 FTC Memoranda filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Tucci, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harris Weingarten on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Weingarten, James)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #157 Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal)(Matheson, Daniel)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Memorandum in opposition to re #151 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #152 MOTION to Compel Production of 2012 and 2014 FTC Memoranda filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(ztth)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #152 MOTION to Compel Production of 2012 and 2014 FTC Memoranda filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztth)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #153 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Court ORDERS that an unredacted version of the document will be filed under seal and a redacted version filed on the public docket. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #154 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F)(Hansen, Mark)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Sealed)(Hansen, Mark)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Compel Production of 2012 and 2014 FTC Memoranda by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support - Redacted, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's #149 Motion to Compel is STRICKEN for violating the Court's Local Rule on excessive footnotes, which also appear in this case as an effort to circumvent page limits. Defendant may refile today with no more than five footnotes containing no more than 20 aggregate lines of text. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/1/2022. (lcjeb2)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re #149 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Compel Answer to Interrogatory No. 10 by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING #147 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/2022. (lcjeb2) Modified to remove "minute" on 6/28/2022 (znbn).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Status Conference held on 6/22/2022. Minute Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall brief the privilege issue as follows: Meta's brief (limited to 30 pages) is due July 5, 2022; the FTC's response (limited to 30 pages) is due July 19, 2022; and Meta's reply (limited to 15 pages) is due July 26, 2022; 2) The parties shall brief the interrogatories issue as follows: Meta's brief (limited to 20 pages) is due on June 30, 2022; the FTC's response (limited to 20 pages) is due July 14, 2022; and Meta's reply (limited to 10 pages) is due July 21, 2022; and 3) The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on Meta's document production by July 29, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/2022. (lcjeb2)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/29/2022. (nbn)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 11:00 AM by VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (lsj)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Discovery for Issuance of Letters of Request by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Bytedance Letter of Request, #3 TRANSLATED Bytedance Letter of Request, #4 Tencent Letter of Request, #5 TRANSLATED Tencent Letter of Request, #6 Telegram Letter of Request)(Hansen, Mark)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, a discovery dispute hearing is set for Wednesday, June 22, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. by Zoom. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/16/2022. (lcjeb2)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meta Attachment, #2 Declaration Meta Attachment)(Matheson, Daniel)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Virginia Goff on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Goff, Karen)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Slattery on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Slattery, Timothy)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by William Stuart Hirschfeld on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Hirschfeld, William)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Edward H. Takashima terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Elyse Tarr on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Tarr, Jennifer)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Orsini on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Orsini, Kevin)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Douglas Harris on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Harris, Christopher)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Michael Mikawa terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lent on behalf of MATCH GROUP, INC. (Lent, Scott)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- C. Scott Lent, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9137912. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MATCH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Scott Lent in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hedge, Justin)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of C. Scott Lent. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/30/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/25/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE of Proposed Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #131 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (Matheson, Daniel)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Brenner on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Brenner, Nathan)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Civil Statement from SNAP INC., PINTEREST, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(ztth)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The parties shall jointly submit a revised proposed Protective Order that incorporates the rulings in the attached Order by March 25, 2022 (2) If Meta agrees with the Third Parties regarding designations, the Protective Order shall include that language; (3) If Meta disagrees, it shall file a brief by March 25, 2022, setting forth its objections, and the parties shall file two proposed Protective Orders, one with the language and one without, and the Court shall make its decision and sign the appropriate one; and (4) Third Parties' #118 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail L. Cessna on behalf of SNAP INC. (Cessna, Abigail)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Moy on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Moy, Jessica)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Revised Proposed Protective Order due by 3/25/2022. (znbn)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Minji Reem on behalf of Pinterest, Inc., Snap Inc. (Reem, Minji)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Holman on behalf of ORACLE CORPORATION (Holman, Craig)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward H. Takashima on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Takashima, Edward)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Zane Watts on behalf of LINKEDIN CORPORATION (Watts, Ryan)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ian Gleklen on behalf of LINKEDIN CORPORATION (Gleklen, Jonathan)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #121 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail L. Cessna. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/17/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Minji Reem, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. was entered in error and counsel has refiled said pleading in docket entry #122 . (zeg)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #122 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Minji Reem. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/17/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. O'Rourke on behalf of TWITTER INC. (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Minji Reem, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9108848. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Pinterest, Inc., Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Minji Reem in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mucchetti, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Abigail L. Cessna, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9108826. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abigail L. Cessna in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mucchetti, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. Hedge on behalf of Match Group, Inc. (Hedge, Justin)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Minji Reem, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Minji Reem in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice)(Mucchetti, Peter) Modified on 3/17/2022 (zeg).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to File Non-Parties Position Statement on the Protective Order by Pinterest, Inc., Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Leave to File, #2 Exhibit Non-Parties Position Statement on the Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Non-Parties Position Statement on the Protective Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mucchetti, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Mucchetti on behalf of Snap Inc., Pinterest, Inc. (Mucchetti, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY re #113 Status Report filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Teng on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Teng, Albert)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David White on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (White, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STATUS REPORT and Proposal for Protective Order by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hansen, Mark)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Eric Cochran terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica Noble on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Noble, Danica)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby L. Dennis on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Dennis, Abby)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 2-28-2022; Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance:3-8-2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Walker Griffith, Telephone number 202 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2022.(Griffith, Lisa)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/8/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d) ORDER. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/8/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Discovery Procedure, #2 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d))(Matheson, Daniel) Modified event title on 3/8/2022 (znmw).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Google Hearing Transcript, #4 Exhibit D- Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #5 Exhibit E- Meta's Proposal)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Musser on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Musser, Susan)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2022. Discovery due by 1/5/2023. Initial Disclosure due by 2/22/2022. Fact Discovery due by 5/22/2023. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/3/2023. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 9/5/2023. (nbn)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/2022. (lcjeb2)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A, Widnell on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's scheduling conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall submit by March 2, 2022, a joint proposed scheduling order based on the Court's rulings today; 2) Plaintiff shall submit a brief of no more than 10 pages regarding contention interrogatories by March 7, 2022, to which Defendant shall respond with similar page limits by March 14, 2022, and Plaintiff shall reply with a brief of no more than 5 pages by March 16, 2022; and 3) If the parties cannot resolve their differences, the same briefing schedule and page limits shall apply to briefs regarding a protective order, ESI order, and Rule 502(d) order. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/28/2022. (lcjeb2)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2022. Joint proposed scheduling order due by 3/2/2022. See Minute Order issued on 2/28/2022. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal Naresh Mehta on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Mehta, Sonal)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sonal N. Mehta. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/22/2022. (lcjeb2)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sonal N. Mehta, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9054923. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gringer, David)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gringer on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Gringer, David)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Rouhandeh on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Rouhandeh, James)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stuart Scheinkman on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (Scheinkman, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for February 28, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/26/2022. (lcjeb2)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #82 Amended Complaint FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF by META PLATFORMS, INC..(Hansen, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Reflect Name Change by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Change of Party Name by FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #93 Motion to Amend the caption of Case No. 1:20-cv-03590-JEB to reflect Defendant's name change from Facebook, Inc. to Meta Platforms, Inc. The Court ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall modify the caption of this case so it reads as: Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff, v. Meta Platforms, Inc., Defendant. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/24/2022. (lcjeb2)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #89 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/11/2022. (lcjeb1)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's #83 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; and (2) Defendant shall file its Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by January 25, 2022. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/11/2022. (lcjeb1)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/25/2022. (nbn)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to opposition to motion re #83 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Amended Complaint filed by FACEBOOK INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Henry J. Hauser terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Memorandum in opposition to re #83 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Amended Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Under Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order Denying Facebook's Motion to Dismiss)(Matheson, Daniel)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Amended Complaint by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT Redacted Substitute Amended Complaint against FACEBOOK INC. filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(Matheson, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #80 Order (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/8/2021. (lcjeb2)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Parties' #78 Joint Filing and Motion Regarding Proposed Redactions to the Substitute Amended Complaint. The COURT orders that: 1) within one calendar day, Plaintiff will file a redacted Substitute Amended Complaint; 2) that the redacted Substitute Amended Complaint will not include redactions for the information previously redacted in paragraphs 7, 21, 31, 40, 43, 54, 55, 57, 59, 61, 70, 75, 104, 126, 150, 176, 177, 178, 181, 182, 184, 185, 186, 193, 194, 198, 199, 200, 201, 211, and 212 of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; and 3) that the redacted Substitute Amended Complaint will redact information from paragraphs 2, 146, 206, 215, and 216, as indicated in the parties' Joint Filing and Motion Regarding Proposed Redactions to the Substitute Amended Complaint. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/8/2021. (lcjeb2)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Joint MOTION For Entry of Stipulated Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint MOTION Regarding Proposed Redactions to the Substitute Amended Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a conference call in Chambers is hereby set for Friday, September 3, 2021, at 10 a.m. to discuss the potential confidential treatment of information. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall dial into Chambers' toll-free conference-call number, (877) 402-9753, at this time (in Chambers). Chambers will contact the parties via email with the dial-in code. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/2/2021. (lcjeb3)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Any party or third party desiring confidential treatment of information contained in the First Amended Complaint shall seek an appropriate order from the Court by 9/7/2021. (nbn)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Any party or third party desiring confidential treatment of information contained in the First Amended Complaint shall seek an appropriate order from the Court by 9/7/2021. (znbn)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Parties' #77 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall remain sealed until September 7, 2021. The Court further ORDERS that any party or third party desiring confidential treatment of information contained in the First Amended Complaint shall seek an appropriate order from the Court by September 7, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/30/2021. (lcjeb2)
August 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 UNREDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Matheson, Daniel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to file First Amended Complaint Under Seal and Memorandum in Support by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted First Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel) Modified event title on 8/20/2021 (znmw).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #75 Motion to file First Amended Complaint Temporarily Under Seal. The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiff's unredacted First Amended Complaint shall remain sealed for ten calendar days from the date of this Order; (2) that any party or third party desiring confidential treatment of information contained in the First Amended Complaint shall seek an appropriate order from the Court within ten calendar days of the date of this Order. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/19/2021. (lcjeb2)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2021. Answer due by 10/4/2021. Responses to Motion to Dismiss due by 11/17/2021. Reply due by 12/1/2021. (znbn)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cerilli, Krisha)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed #74 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ADOPTS the parties' proposed schedule and ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by August 19, 2021; 2) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint by October 4, 2021; 3) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, if any, by November 17, 2021; and 4) Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by December 1, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2021. (lcjeb2)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #72 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/28/2021. (lcjeb2)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Facebook's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (3) Plaintiff shall file any amended Complaint by July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/28/2021. (lcjeb2)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2021. (znbn)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE re #69 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 69) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #70 Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's [70-1] Response is deemed filed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/2021. (lcjeb2)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #63 Motion to Compel Rule 26(f) Conference is DENIED. Given that Facebook's Motion to Dismiss raises a number of serious challenges to the Complaint, it would be premature for the parties to discuss discovery until the contours of what, if anything, remains are known. As the Court expects to issue a decision next month, moreover, there is little possibility of delay adversely affecting Plaintiff. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/11/2021. (lcjeb2)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to opposition to motion re #63 MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE re #64 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #65 Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's Response, attached as Exhibit 1 to its Motion, is deemed filed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/2021. (lcjeb2)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 64) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to opposition to motion re #56 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint filed by FACEBOOK INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Mary Casale terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 21-CV-02108. (Matheson, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Memorandum in opposition to re #56 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Matheson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-02017. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-01518. (Matheson, Daniel)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Hansen, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:21-cv-01117. (Matheson, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00337. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00336. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00618. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie V. Pope on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Pope, Leslie)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Huff on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Huff, Kevin)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REDACTED DOCUMENT - Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/10/2021. Responses due by 4/7/2021. Replies due by 4/21/2021. (znbn)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #48 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by March 10, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, if any, by April 7, 2021; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by April 21, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KEVIN B. HUFF. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #41 Motion to Consolidate is HELD IN ABEYANCE until the Court reviews any forthcoming motions to dismiss or, if such are not filed, the initial scheduling conference. The parties are further advised that the Local Rules do not provide for notices of motions; parties should simply file the motions themselves. Any further motion notices will be stricken. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LESLIE V. POPE. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #42 Motion. The Court ORDERS that: (1) the Clerk of the Court shall place on the public docket Plaintiff's revised partially redacted Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the #42 Motion; and (2) Plaintiff's unredacted Complaint shall remain sealed until further Order of the Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg as there is an earlier related case. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #41 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Consolidate in State of New York, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., 20-cv-3589-JEB, and #43 Defendant's Notice of Response thereto, the Court, with the consent of Judge Boasberg, hereby directs the Clerk of Court, pursuant to Local Civil Rules 40.5(a)(3) and (c)(2), to transfer this case to the Calendar Committee for reassignment to Judge Boasberg as related to civil action 20-cv-3589. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2021. (lccrc2)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Burke W. Kappler terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:20-cv-08817. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 4:20-cv-9217. (Matheson, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Response to Motion to Consolidate by FACEBOOK INC. re #41 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Revised Partially Redacted Complaint and Updated Proposal Regarding Sealing re #3 Redacted Document Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel) Modified relief on 12/28/2020 (znmw).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FACEBOOK waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/7/2021. (Matheson, Daniel) Modified to correct party waiving service on 12/21/2020 (ztd).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leslie V. Pope, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7978186. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie V. Pope, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kevin)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin B. Huff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-7978098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin B. Huff, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kevin)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Silvija A. Strikis on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Strikis, Silvija)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Martin Panner on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Panner, Aaron)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Miller on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Miller, Kevin)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Klineberg on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Klineberg, Geoffrey)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Charles Hansen on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-cv-09130. (Matheson, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Brian Telpner terminated. (Telpner, Brian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Telpner on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Telpner, Brian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-CV-08815. (Matheson, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Zuver, Jr on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zuver, Robert)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mikawa on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Mikawa, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Cochran on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cochran, Eric)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen T. Masters on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Masters, Owen)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Mitchell London, Jr on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (London, Gary)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Burke W. Kappler on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Kappler, Burke)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J. Hauser on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Hauser, Henry)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Galvan on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Galvan, Patricia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria M. DiMoscato on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (DiMoscato, Maria)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Krisha A. Cerilli on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cerilli, Krisha)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Casale on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Casale, Mary)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia Zhang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zhang, Sylvia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Smith on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Smith, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Weinstein on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Weinstein, Rebecca)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Silvia on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Silvia, Mark)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Owyang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Owyang, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Miller on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Miller, Noel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-cv-08721. (Matheson, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-03589. (Matheson, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERRATA Correction to Signature Page of Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION #6 Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztd)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK INC. filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(ztd); (See docket entry no. #3 to view.)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. N.D. Cal 20-cv-363 BLF. (ztd)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. N.D. Cal 28-8570. (ztd)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ztd)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/9/2020. (ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. META PLATFORMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK INC.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Klineberg
Represented By: Leslie V. Pope
Represented By: Kevin J. Miller
Represented By: Mark Charles Hansen
Represented By: Silvija A. Strikis
Represented By: Kevin Huff
Represented By: Aaron Martin Panner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC.
Represented By: Mark Charles Hansen
Represented By: David Gringer
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Represented By: Michael Stuart Scheinkman
Represented By: Sonal Naresh Mehta
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Kevin Huff
Represented By: Catalina Vergara
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Klineberg
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Perry A. Lange
Represented By: Daniel V. Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Gary Mitchell London, Jr
Represented By: Sylvia Zhang
Represented By: Michael Mikawa
Represented By: Burke W. Kappler
Represented By: Robert E. Zuver, Jr
Represented By: Noel Miller
Represented By: Mary Casale
Represented By: Daniel John Matheson
Represented By: Krisha A. Cerilli
Represented By: David E. Owyang
Represented By: Maria M. DiMoscato
Represented By: Owen T. Masters
Represented By: Michael H Smith
Represented By: Rebecca Weinstein
Represented By: Henry J. Hauser
Represented By: Patricia Galvan
Represented By: Eric Cochran
Represented By: Mark Silvia
Represented By: Brian Telpner
Represented By: Robert E. Zuver, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas A, Widnell
Represented By: Abby L. Dennis
Represented By: Danica Noble
Represented By: Susan Musser
Represented By: Albert Teng
Represented By: Edward H. Takashima
Represented By: Jessica Moy
Represented By: Michael David White
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Brenner
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Harris
Represented By: Jennifer Elyse Tarr
Represented By: Karen Virginia Goff
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: William Stuart Hirschfeld
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Represented By: Peter Taylor
Represented By: Njeri Mugure
Represented By: Erin Frake
Represented By: Anusha Sunkara
Represented By: Ario Fazli
Represented By: Stephen Pearson, III
Represented By: Justin Lorber
Represented By: Oren Vitenson
Represented By: June Burton
Represented By: Alicia Loh
Represented By: June Hee Im
Represented By: Melissa M. Ihnat
Represented By: David Brunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SNAP INC.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Mucchetti
Represented By: Abigail L. Cessna
Represented By: Minji Reem
Represented By: Justina Sessions
Represented By: John Karin
Represented By: Robin Susan Crauthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PINTEREST, INC.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Mucchetti
Represented By: Minji Reem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MATCH GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Justin P. Hedge
Represented By: C. Scott Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TWITTER INC.
Represented By: Kenneth R. O'Rourke
Represented By: Peter Joseph Mucchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LINKEDIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Gleklen
Represented By: Ryan Zane Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ORACLE CORPORATION
Represented By: Craig A. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SEQUOIA CAPITAL OPERATIONS. LLC
Represented By: Samer Makram Musallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TIKTOK INC.
Represented By: David P. Wales
Represented By: Julia K. York
Represented By: Steven C. Sunshine
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Angela Marie Farren
Represented By: Craig Matthew Reiser
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Crystal Danielle Dudding Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alpha Exploration Co. Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Margo
Represented By: Jordan R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALPHABET INC.
Represented By: Evan D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?