DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC v. TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC, DRAF, LLC and DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE (DRAF), LLC
Defendant: TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03668
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 23, 2020. (lccjn3)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re Order,,, by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC. (Hochman Rothell, Bonnie) Modified event title on 12/28/2020 (znmw).
December 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' #9 Notice of Proposed Consent Order, the Parties appear to have voluntarily resolved Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Parties do not appear, however, to have made the showings necessary for the entry of a consent decree. See, e.g., United States v. Wells Fargo Bank, 891 F. Supp. 2d 143, 144-45 (D.D.C. 2012). It is therefore ORDERED that by December 22, 2020, the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report setting forth a supplemental briefing schedule for the purpose of demonstrating that their #9 Proposed Consent Order "is fair, adequate, reasonable and appropriate under the particular facts and there has been valid consent by the concerned parties." Id. at 145. Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is held in abeyance. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 19, 2020. (lccjn3)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Proposed Order Consent Order by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Attorney Fees , Set/Reset Deadlines, Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, (Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 5:00 p.m. on December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 18, 2020. (lccjn3)
December 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11:59 AM on 12/18/2020. (zkh)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Attorney Fees by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021 (Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report setting forth a recommended briefing schedule for the resolution of Plaintiff's Motion by 11:59 a.m. on December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 17, 2020. (lccjn3)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 15, 2020. (lccjn3)
December 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC (Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7956541) filed by DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Summons)(Hochman Rothell, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC v. TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE, LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Y. Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRAF, LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Y. Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK RUTLEDGE ABOUT FACE (DRAF), LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Y. Hochman Rothell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROIKA INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?