CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, AURELIA SKIPWITH, MARGARET EVERSON and NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv03697
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Referring Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/08/2021. (lcrjl3)
January 15, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Zaccardi, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Zaccardi, Andrea)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 1/13/2021; MARGARET EVERSON served on 1/13/2021; NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 1/13/2021; AURELIA SKIPWITH served on 1/13/2021; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 1/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Zaccardi, Andrea)
January 14, 2021 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case as deemed unrelated pursuant to #10 Order dated 1/13/2021. (ztnr)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Contrary to Plaintiff's contention, Dkt. #3 , the Court concludes that this case is not related to Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Department of the Interior, No. 20-cv-1959, under D.D.C. Local Rule 40.5. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall return this case to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for random reassignment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/13/2021. (lcrdm3)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #3 Notice of Related Case filed by DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, AURELIA SKIPWITH, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (See Docket Entry #9 to view document) (zjf)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, MARGARET EVERSON, AURELIA SKIPWITH, DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE re #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, MARGARET EVERSON, AURELIA SKIPWITH, DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Frances)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY re #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Zaccardi, Andrea)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Zaccardi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaccardi, Andrea) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/7/2021) (znmw).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall, on or before January 8, 2021, show cause why (or why not) this case qualifies as "related" to Civil Action No. 20-cv-1959, under the Local Civil Rules of this District. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2020. (lcrdm3)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Andrea Zaccardi is hereby GRANTED leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2020. (lcrdm3)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, AURELIA SKIPWITH, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrea Zaccardi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7966429. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Zaccardi in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01959-RDM. (Snape, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Snape, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, AURELIA SKIPWITH, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7966297) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to David Bernhardt, #3 Summons to Aurelia Skipwith, #4 Summons to Margaret Everson, #5 Summons to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #6 Summons to National Park Service, #7 Summons to U.S. Attorney, #8 Summons to Attorney General)(Snape, William)
December 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Frances Bishop Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Frances Bishop Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURELIA SKIPWITH
Represented By: Frances Bishop Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET EVERSON
Represented By: Frances Bishop Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Represented By: Frances Bishop Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Andrea Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?