NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Defendant: MARGARET EVERSON, DAVID BERNHARDT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv03706
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DAVID BERNHARDT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/25/2021. (lcrc2)
January 25, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/8/2021. (tj)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark James Widerschein on behalf of All Defendants (Widerschein, Mark)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Q. Andrews on behalf of NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Andrews, Paul)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Paul Q. Andrews is admitted to represent Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/28/2020. (lcrc2)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Q. Andrews, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7972652. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Q. Andrews in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rumsey, Allison)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Rumsey, Allison)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B. Rumsey on behalf of NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Rumsey, Allison)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, MARGARET EVERSON, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7972327) filed by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - William Barr, #4 Summons - David Bernhardt, #5 Summons - Department of the Interior, #6 Summons - Margaret Everson, #7 Summons - National Park Service, #8 Summons - Michael R. Sherwin)(Rosenbaum, Robert)
December 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET EVERSON
Represented By: Mark James Widerschein
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Mark James Widerschein
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Mark James Widerschein
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Represented By: Mark James Widerschein
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Allison B. Rumsey
Represented By: Robert David Rosenbaum
Represented By: Paul Q. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?