GRUESBECK v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC et al
Plaintiff: MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC, COOPERSURGICAL, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC and COOPER COMPANIES, INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03716
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Georgia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 2/8/2021; sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) dated 2/8/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Leigh Martin May for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2974) (ztnr)
February 8, 2021 Receipt of Electronic Transfer; Other Court Number 1:21-cv-574 sent by the Northern District of Georgia. (ztnr)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Potential Tag-Along Action by MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK. (ztth)
February 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/12/2021. (znbn)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or otherwise respond, by COOPER COMPANIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Christopher)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COOPER COMPANIES, INC (Schwartz, Christopher)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kip Schwartz on behalf of COOPER COMPANIES, INC (Schwartz, Christopher)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 12, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2021. (lcjeb1)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK. (ztth)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Reissued Electronically as to TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC. (ztth)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Gallant, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK. Case related to Case No. MDL 2974. (Gallant, Michael)
December 18, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to Michael.Gallant@drlawllp.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing Related Case form. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case. (adh, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7973348) filed by MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RELATED CASE, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Gallant, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRUESBECK v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER COMPANIES, INC
Represented By: Christopher Kip Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE ANN GRUESBECK
Represented By: Michael E. Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?