RUPPERT v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv03725
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file a reply to Plaintiff's 17 Objection to Defendant's Request for Extension by no later than FEBRUARY 17, 2021. Defendant shall address the specific objections raised by Plaintiff, including those related to SSA's internal operating procedures. Defendant shall also identify the date by which it anticipates the transcript of the remand hearing being prepared and whether it may do so on an expedited basis, given that it appears most of the administrative record prior to remand proceedings has already been filed in a previous case, See No. 18-cv-148, ECF No. 10. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/12/21. (lcckk3)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Administrative Record filed by MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT. (Benagh, Christine)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Administrative Record by ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Gigliotti, Brittany). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 2/12/2021 (ztd).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/21/20. (DM)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine P Benagh on behalf of MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT (Benagh, Christine)
December 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT. (Casciano, Peter) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/4/2021) (znmw).
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7975952) filed by MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Casciano, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/4/2021) (znmw).
December 18, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to pcasciano@a-f.net, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUPPERT v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Brittany Johanna Gigliotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY GIORDANO RUPPERT
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Casciano
Represented By: Christine P Benagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?