TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES et al v. NISHIDA
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION, SIERRA CLUB, RISE ST. JAMES and CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS
Defendant: ANDREW R. WHEELER and JANE NISHIDA
Case Number: 1:2020cv03733
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Higgins on behalf of ANDREW R. WHEELER (Higgins, Elliot) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/25/2021) (zjf).
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/26/2021. (Riley, Kathleen)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/2020. (Riley, Kathleen)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW R. WHEELER served on 12/28/2020 (Riley, Kathleen)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW R. WHEELER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma C. Cheuse on behalf of CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION, RISE ST. JAMES, SIERRA CLUB, TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES (Cheuse, Emma)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Kron, Adam)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RISE ST. JAMES (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES (Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7977512) filed by SIERRA CLUB, RISE ST. JAMES, TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons of Andrew Wheeler, #3 Summons of William Barr, #4 Summons of Michael Sherwin)(Riley, Kathleen)
December 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES et al v. NISHIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW R. WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE NISHIDA
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Adam Matthew Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ADVOCACY SERVICES
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RISE ST. JAMES
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS
Represented By: Kathleen Lea Riley
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?