BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, ST. CLARE, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC. doing business as BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRINITY HOSPITAL HOLDING COMPANY doing business as TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC. doing business as LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM formerly doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL - DETROIT, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE HEALTH RALEIGH HOSPITAL, ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ST. CLARE SCHENECTADY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SINAI GRACE HOSPITAL, GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION doing business as MOBILE INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, KALEIDA HEALTH, HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as HENRY FORD HOSPITAL and ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03760
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Orloff, Serena)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 19, 2021. (lccjn2)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/20/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/29/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/28/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM, KALEIDA HEALTH, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ST. CLARE SCHENECTADY, ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM, TRINITY HOSPITAL HOLDING COMPANY, VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC. (Webster, Stephanie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7982126) filed by TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ST. CLARE SCHENECTADY, BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL, TRINITY HOSPITAL HOLDING COMPANY, LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC., VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER, KALEIDA HEALTH, MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION, THE UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT'S MIDTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CLARE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKS-TLC HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC. doing business as BROOKS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITY HOSPITAL HOLDING COMPANY doing business as TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKELAND HOSPITAL AT NILES AND ST. JOSEPH, INC. doing business as LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITY HEALTH SYSTEM formerly doing business as MERCY HOSPITAL - DETROIT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE HEALTH RALEIGH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ST. CLARE SCHENECTADY
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as DUKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITY HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS SINAI-GRACE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as SINAI GRACE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEISINGER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOBILE INFIRMARY ASSOCIATION doing business as MOBILE INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEIDA HEALTH
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as HENRY FORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. CLARE'S CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?