COKER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: OLUSHOLA COKER
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, CHAD WOLF, ELIZABETH MILLER and KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2020cv03763
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH CUCCINELLI served on 12/30/2020; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/30/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/30/2020; CHAD WOLF served on 12/30/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/31/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/31/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH CUCCINELLI, ELIZABETH MILLER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7983331) filed by OLUSHOLA COKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COKER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH MILLER
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Sian Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLUSHOLA COKER
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?