SENTARA HOSPITALS et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SENTARA PRINCESS ANNE HOSPITAL, SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA VIRGINIA BEACH GENERAL HOSPITAL, POTOMAC HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF PRINCE WILLIAM doing business as SENTARA NORTHERN VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA WILLIAMSBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA CAREPLEX HOSPITAL, SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA LEIGH HOSPITAL, SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA OBICI HOSPITAL and SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA NORFOLK GENERAL HOSPITALS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03771
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of consent to a magistrate judge by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/20/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/2020. (Webster, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/28/2020 (Webster, Stephanie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by POTOMAC HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF PRINCE WILLIAM, SENTARA HOSPITALS, SENTARA PRINCESS ANNE HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7985874) filed by SENTARA HOSPITALS, SENTARA PRINCESS ANNE HOSPITAL, POTOMAC HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF PRINCE WILLIAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENTARA HOSPITALS et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA PRINCESS ANNE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA VIRGINIA BEACH GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POTOMAC HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF PRINCE WILLIAM doing business as SENTARA NORTHERN VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA WILLIAMSBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA CAREPLEX HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA LEIGH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA OBICI HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTARA HOSPITALS doing business as SENTARA NORFOLK GENERAL HOSPITALS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?