PELTIER et al v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Wilkie Peltier, ANDREW L. LAVERDURE, LEONA KIENENBERGER, JOSEPHINE OATS CORCORAN, BERNADETTE ANNE SPAHR, JOYCE ELAINE DEMARRE STEWART, EDWARD TIMOTHY RAMSTED, AMELIA EVETTE LAFRINIE ROY, CHANE WEYMER SALOIS, KATHLEEN ANN FRANKLIN, DAWN LOUISE ROATH, ANDREA LAVERDURE, TACEY LYNN FOSTER, ANNETTE MARIE CHARETTE, FRANK STEPHEN LHOTKA, DOROTHY MARILYN GAY, JEREMY JOHN LEE RINDAHL, MIKEALINDA MARAE GRANT, DEVI COLE, TWILA MARIE JEROME, CLAIRE MAE ROATH, YVONNE MARIE HILL, ROBERTA MORIN LORD, TINA MARIE TAYLOR, CAROL SUE DONEY HOFELDT, AARON VASECKA, EUNICE MAE BELLANGER, COREENA JOY PATNAUDE, LAVONNE MARIE BROWN, KENNETH ZANE BLATT ST. MARKS, DEBORAH LEA RONNENG, GAIL EAGLEMAN, LEE WILLIAM WILKIE, BELINDA MAY HARVILL, CHARLENE BIG KNIFE, CHRYSTEL AURORA CORNELIUS, TOBY LEE LAMERE, WILLIAM DALLAS WADE SUN CHILD, ROBERT S. DECOTEAU, GAILE LYNN TORRES, PEGGY ANN PENA, GEORGI ANN MITCHELL, JAMES MELVIN WEIGAND, GLADYS J. TORKELSON, SHANE MICHAEL BRIEN, DELVIN CREE, LARRY JAMES SALOIS, LARRY JOSEPH MORSETTE, JR., DEANNA M. TROTTIER WIRTZBERGER, DEBRA JOSEPHINE NEWGARD, WILFRED VERNON DENTZ, DALE ROGER PESCH, RICHARD EDWARD LAWSON, DANIEL BOYD WILLIAMS, LOLA GREATWALKER, MARYJO ELIZABETH RUST, JOHN WAYNE GILBERT, CAROL ANN DAVIS, REGINA RUTH HOWARD, PETER FREDRICK DONEY, TAMMY JEAN WILKIE POITRA, BARBARA ANN MARIE POITRA, KATHLEEN BUTCHER, TAMMIE MAY SIMMONS and MARIE LOUISE NIELSEN
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and STEVEN MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2020cv03775
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: GRANTING #15 Motion to Certify Class; GRANTING #15 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on February 16, 2021. (JRM).
February 14, 2021 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on February 11, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-42. Date of Issuance: February 14, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2021.(Edwards, Lisa)
February 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2021. Oral ruling issued GRANTING #15 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class and Preliminarily Approve Class Action Settlement Agreement. A written order will issue from Chambers. Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2021. Status Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 02:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards) (hs)
February 10, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 2/11/2021 at 03:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs)
January 29, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #15 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class and Preliminarily Approve Class Action Settlement Agreement MOTION for Settlement filed by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Hoang, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION (JOINT) OF THE PARTIES REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND COMMUNICATIONS, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Hoang, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION (JOINT) OF THE PARTIES REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS, DATA, AND/OR OTHER MATERIALS PROVIDED BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Hoang, Anthony)
January 22, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM re #15 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class and Preliminarily Approve Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Class Action Settlement Agreement Executed, #2 Exhibit B Proposed Long-Form Notice, #3 Exhibit C Proposed Summary Notice, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Claim Form, #5 Exhibit E Table of Named Representatives To Date, #6 Exhibit F Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees and Case Costs to Date)(McCoy, Melody)
January 22, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class and Preliminarily Approve Class Action Settlement Agreement by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 Class Action Settlement Agreement Executed, #3 Exhibit 2 Long-Form Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 Claim Form)(McCoy, Melody). Added MOTION to Approve Settlement on 1/26/2021 (znmw).
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES (CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) by DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Hoang, Anthony)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Leave Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Certification of Settlement Class and Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement is permitted to exceed LCvR 7(e)'s page limitation by an additional 40 pages. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 21, 2021. (JRM).
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Thomas F. Hogan, held on 1-13-2021. Page Numbers: 1 - 18. Date of Issuance: 1-19-2021. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in the amount of 40 additional pages in Opening Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Class Certification and Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(McCoy, Melody)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants filed by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER.(McCoy, Melody)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021. Plaintiffs Motions due by 1/22/2021. Government's Response due by 2/1/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2021 at 01:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loft) (hs)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim J. Gottschalk on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gottschalk, Kim)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER. (McCoy, Melody)
January 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Minute Order filed on 1/7/2021, was entered in error and was refiled by the law clerk. (zgdf)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave for Kim Gottschalk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 7, 2021. (KDD).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Leave for Kim Gottschalk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 7, 2021. (KDD). Modified on 1/7/2021 (zgdf).
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kim Jerome Gottschalk, on behalf of Plaintiffs Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8039489. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel K Gottschalk, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(McCoy, Melody)
December 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Status Conference previously set on 1/6/2021 is RESET for 1/13/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs)
December 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby SET for Wednesday, January 6, 2021 at 10:00 AM via teleconference. The parties may contact the Courtroom Deputy for teleconference information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on December 29, 2020. (KDD).
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Hoang on behalf of All Defendants (Hoang, Anthony)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Summons #4, #4 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
December 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zsb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER re #3 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(McCoy, Melody)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Errata by LESLIE WILKIE PELTIER re #3 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(McCoy, Melody)
December 22, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #3 Complaint; emailed to mmccoy@narf.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. The order of the filings were submitted incorrectly. The COMLAINT should've been docket entry number 1. The NOTICE OF RELATED CASE should've been docket entry number 2. NOTICE should be DKT #3., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmd, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against Leslie Wilkie Peltier Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7985780) filed by Leslie Wilkie Peltier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons Michael Sherwin, #4 Summons David Bernhardt, #5 Summons Steven Mnuchin)(McCoy, Melody)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melody L. McCoy on behalf of Leslie Wilkie Peltier (McCoy, Melody)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Leslie Wilkie Peltier. Case related to Case No. 96-1285. (McCoy, Melody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PELTIER et al v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Wilkie Peltier
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW L. LAVERDURE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONA KIENENBERGER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPHINE OATS CORCORAN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE ANNE SPAHR
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE ELAINE DEMARRE STEWART
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD TIMOTHY RAMSTED
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMELIA EVETTE LAFRINIE ROY
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANE WEYMER SALOIS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN ANN FRANKLIN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN LOUISE ROATH
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA LAVERDURE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TACEY LYNN FOSTER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE MARIE CHARETTE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK STEPHEN LHOTKA
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY MARILYN GAY
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY JOHN LEE RINDAHL
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKEALINDA MARAE GRANT
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVI COLE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWILA MARIE JEROME
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAIRE MAE ROATH
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVONNE MARIE HILL
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA MORIN LORD
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA MARIE TAYLOR
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL SUE DONEY HOFELDT
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON VASECKA
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUNICE MAE BELLANGER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREENA JOY PATNAUDE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAVONNE MARIE BROWN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH ZANE BLATT ST. MARKS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LEA RONNENG
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL EAGLEMAN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE WILLIAM WILKIE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA MAY HARVILL
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE BIG KNIFE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRYSTEL AURORA CORNELIUS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOBY LEE LAMERE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DALLAS WADE SUN CHILD
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT S. DECOTEAU
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAILE LYNN TORRES
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY ANN PENA
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGI ANN MITCHELL
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MELVIN WEIGAND
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS J. TORKELSON
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE MICHAEL BRIEN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELVIN CREE
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY JAMES SALOIS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY JOSEPH MORSETTE, JR.
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA M. TROTTIER WIRTZBERGER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA JOSEPHINE NEWGARD
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILFRED VERNON DENTZ
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE ROGER PESCH
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD EDWARD LAWSON
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BOYD WILLIAMS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOLA GREATWALKER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYJO ELIZABETH RUST
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WAYNE GILBERT
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL ANN DAVIS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA RUTH HOWARD
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER FREDRICK DONEY
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY JEAN WILKIE POITRA
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA ANN MARIE POITRA
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN BUTCHER
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE MAY SIMMONS
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE LOUISE NIELSEN
Represented By: Melody L. McCoy
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Anthony P. Hoang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Represented By: Anthony P. Hoang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?