AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER also known as LANCASTER HOSPITAL, HRI HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HRI HOSPITAL also known as HUMAN RESOURCE INSTITUTE, UHS OF ANCHOR, L.P. doing business as SOUTHERN CRESCENT BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM also known as ANCHOR HOSPITAL, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as MCALLEN HEART HOSPITAL also known as MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL, AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TURNING POINT CARE CENTER, LLC doing business as TURNING POINT HOSPITAL, UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC. doing business as SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, UHS OF WESTWOOD PEMBROKE, INC. doing business as WESTWOOD LODGE HOSPITAL, NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, UHS OF DENVER, INC. doing business as HIGHLANDS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP doing business as GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HUMAN RESOURCE INSTITUTE, UHS OF OKLAHOMA, INC. doing business as ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL, UHS OF DOVER, LLC doing business as DOVER BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF ROCKFORD, LLC doing business as ROCKFORD CENTER, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF LAREDO, FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF FAIRMOUNT, INC. doing business as FAIRMOUNT BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, KEYSTONE WSNC, LLC doing business as OLD VINEYARD BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as SOUTH TEXAS HEALTH SYSTEM, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF RIDGE, LLC doing business as RIDGE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, TWO RIVERS PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as TWO RIVERS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, UHS OF NEW ORLEANS, INC. doing business as CHALMETTE MEDICAL CENTERS, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SPRING VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FOREST VIEW PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FOREST VIEW HOSPITAL, UHS OF LAKESIDE, LLC doing business as LAKESIDE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, LANCASTER HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DESERT SPRINGS HOSPITAL, UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. doing business as ROXBURY TREATMENT CENTER, THE PAVILION FOUNDATION doing business as THE PAVILION BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as LAKEWOOD RANCH MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF GREENVILLE, LLC doing business as CAROLINA CENTER FOR BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. doing business as THE HORSHAM CLINIC, UHS-CORONA, INC. doing business as CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF HARTGROVE, INC. doing business as HARTGROVE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM, UHS OF FULLER, INC. doing business as FULLER HOSPITAL, SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NORTHERN NEVADA MEDICAL CENTER, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC. doing business as TEXOMA MEDICAL CENTER, MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE BRIDGEWAY, LLC doing business as THE BRIDGEWAY, UHS OF PEACHFORD, L.P. doing business as PEACHFORD HOSPITAL, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as EDINBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANCHOR HOSPITAL, BRIDGEWAY, LLC doing business as BRIDGEWAY and PAVILION FOUNDATION doing business as PAVILION BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv03828
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 2/8/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/8/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/3/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peabody, Arthur)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/29/2020. (lctnm3)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP, FOREST VIEW PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC., FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., HRI HOSPITAL, INC., KEYSTONE WSNC, LLC, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P., MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P., NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, THE BRIDGEWAY, LLC, THE PAVILION FOUNDATION, TURNING POINT CARE CENTER, LLC, TWO RIVERS PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC., UHS OF ANCHOR, L.P., UHS OF DENVER, INC., UHS OF DOVER, LLC, UHS OF FAIRMOUNT, INC., UHS OF FULLER, INC., UHS OF GREENVILLE, LLC, UHS OF HARTGROVE, INC., UHS OF LAKESIDE, LLC, UHS OF NEW ORLEANS, INC., UHS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., UHS OF PEACHFORD, L.P., UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., UHS OF RIDGE, LLC, UHS OF ROCKFORD, LLC, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC., UHS OF WESTWOOD PEMBROKE, INC., UHS-CORONA, INC., UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC., VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC (Peabody, Arthur)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 11-cv-1717. (Peabody, Arthur)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8009812) filed by NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., FOREST VIEW PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC., SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., UHS OF HARTGROVE, INC., UHS OF RIDGE, LLC, UHS OF DOVER, LLC, UHS OF OKLAHOMA, INC., FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., UHS OF LAKESIDE, LLC, UHS OF WESTWOOD PEMBROKE, INC., TURNING POINT CARE CENTER, LLC, SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, UHS OF FULLER, INC., WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, UHS OF GREENVILLE, LLC, UHS OF ROCKFORD, LLC, UHS OF TEXOMA, INC., UHS OF FAIRMOUNT, INC., UHS OF NEW ORLEANS, INC., UHS OF ANCHOR, L.P., THE PAVILION FOUNDATION, LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P., TWO RIVERS PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC., MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P., CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HRI HOSPITAL, INC., UHS OF DENVER, INC., UHS-CORONA, INC., THE BRIDGEWAY, LLC, MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P., KEYSTONE WSNC, LLC, UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC., UHS OF PEACHFORD, L.P., LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Alex M. Azar II, Sec'y, U.S. Dep't of Health and Human Servs., #5 Summons to Hon. Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting Attorney General of the United States, #6 Summons to Hon. Michael R. Sherwin, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #7 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, U.S. Dep't of Health and Human Servs.)(Peabody, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER also known as LANCASTER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRI HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as HRI HOSPITAL also known as HUMAN RESOURCE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF ANCHOR, L.P. doing business as SOUTHERN CRESCENT BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM also known as ANCHOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as MCALLEN HEART HOSPITAL also known as MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TURNING POINT CARE CENTER, LLC doing business as TURNING POINT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS, INC. doing business as SOUTHWEST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF WESTWOOD PEMBROKE, INC. doing business as WESTWOOD LODGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as NORTHWEST TEXAS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF DENVER, INC. doing business as HIGHLANDS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT HOSPITAL PARTNERS, LP doing business as GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as WELLINGTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMAN RESOURCE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF OKLAHOMA, INC. doing business as ST. MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN MEDICAL HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF DOVER, LLC doing business as DOVER BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CENTRAL MONTGOMERY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF ROCKFORD, LLC doing business as ROCKFORD CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAREDO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF LAREDO
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, L.P. doing business as FORT DUNCAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF FAIRMOUNT, INC. doing business as FAIRMOUNT BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYSTONE WSNC, LLC doing business as OLD VINEYARD BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as SOUTH TEXAS HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as AUBURN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF RIDGE, LLC doing business as RIDGE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWO RIVERS PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as TWO RIVERS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF NEW ORLEANS, INC. doing business as CHALMETTE MEDICAL CENTERS
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SPRING VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOREST VIEW PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FOREST VIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF LAKESIDE, LLC doing business as LAKESIDE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DESERT SPRINGS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. doing business as ROXBURY TREATMENT CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PAVILION FOUNDATION doing business as THE PAVILION BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as LAKEWOOD RANCH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF GREENVILLE, LLC doing business as CAROLINA CENTER FOR BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. doing business as THE HORSHAM CLINIC
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS-CORONA, INC. doing business as CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF HARTGROVE, INC. doing business as HARTGROVE BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF FULLER, INC. doing business as FULLER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as NORTHERN NEVADA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF TEXOMA, INC. doing business as TEXOMA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as MANATEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BRIDGEWAY, LLC doing business as THE BRIDGEWAY
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS OF PEACHFORD, L.P. doing business as PEACHFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCALLEN HOSPITALS, L.P. doing business as EDINBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANCHOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGEWAY, LLC doing business as BRIDGEWAY
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAVILION FOUNDATION doing business as PAVILION BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Arthur Erwin Peabody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?