APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 et al v. FACEBOOK, INC.
Petitioner: REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA
Respondent: FACEBOOK, INC.
In Re: APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782
Case Number: 1:2020mc00036
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #1 MOTION for Authorization Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the #7 Joint Stipulation and Request for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall file its Opposition or other response to Petitioner's Motion by no later than August 4, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner shall file its Reply by no later than August 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 7/21/2020. (lcdar3)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Request for Extension of Time by FACEBOOK, INC., REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the #6 Joint Stipulation and Request for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall file its Opposition or other response to Petitioner's Motion by no later than July 21, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner shall file its Reply by no later than July 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 7/7/2020. (lcdar3)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Request for Extension of Time by FACEBOOK, INC., REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Request for Extension of Time by FACEBOOK, INC., REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the #5 Joint Stipulation and Request for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall file its Opposition or other response to Petitioner's Motion by no later than July 7, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner shall file its Reply by no later than July 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/26/2020. (lcdar3)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests and Corporate Disclosure Statement by FACEBOOK, INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
June 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/30/2020. Reply due by 7/7/2020. (lcdar3)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent shall file its Opposition or other response to Petitioner's Motion by no later than June 30, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner shall file its Reply by no later than July 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/18/2020. (lcdar3)
June 12, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616103295. (zmd)
June 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management. (zsb)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for full case management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/9/2020. (lcjeb1)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Schedule A, #4 Exhibit Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Subpoena, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 et al v. FACEBOOK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REPUBLIC OF THE GAMBIA
Represented By: Timothy P. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?