US DOMINION, INC. et al v. POWELL et al
Plaintiff: DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, US DOMINION, INC. and DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, P.C. and SIDNEY POWELL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jason Eisenstein on behalf of DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC. (Eisenstein, Marc)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/12/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2023. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2023. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2023. Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2023. Initial Disclosure due by 3/25/2022. due by 8/29/2022. Status Conference set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19- In Person before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcal)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 1, 2022. (lccjn2)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Laranda Walker on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Walker, Laranda)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sammons, Mary)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Mikhail Rux, I on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Rux, Jordan)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to opposition to motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim filed by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sammons, Mary)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #59 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Reply to the Counter-Plaintiffs' Opposition to Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Counter-Defendants must file a reply to the opposition to the motion to dismiss the counterclaims on or before January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 14, 2022. (lccjn2)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 1/18/2022. (zcal)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ERRATA Proposed Order by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. re #59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim filed by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, US DOMINION, INC., DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Sammons, Mary)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Sammons, Mary)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in opposition to re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim filed by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Memo, #3 Exhibit Ex A Turner Ltr)(Joseph, Lawrence) Modified docket event/text on 12/17/2021 (zeg).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Defendants' #57 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss on or before December 15, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss on ore before January 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 24, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/15/2021. Reply due by 1/14/2022. (zcal)
November 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Opposition and the Reply, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Joseph, Lawrence)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Sammons on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Sammons, Mary)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Powell's Counterclaim by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Florence)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mary Kathryn Sammons, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Mary Kathryn Sammons is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Chen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chen, Florence)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mary Kathryn Sammons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8860171. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Kathryn Sammons, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Plaintiffs' #51 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Counterclaim, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall Respond on or before November 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 14, 2021. (lccjn2)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #49 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and Defendant's Answer. Accordingly, the Parties shall meet and confer to discuss each of the matters set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(c). The Parties shall submit a Joint Meet and Confer Report once the Parties in all related cases have had the opportunity to discuss a Joint Scheduling Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report, the Court will, if necessary, schedule an Initial Scheduling Conference. Following submission of the Joint Meet and Confer Report or following the Initial Scheduling Conference, the Court will issue a Scheduling Order governing proceedings in the case. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC.. Attorney Jesse R Binnall terminated. (Binnall, Jesse)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C..(Joseph, Lawrence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-02294-RBW. (Shackelford, Stephen)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-02296-RBW. (Shackelford, Stephen)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of Defendants' #46 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or other respond to the Complaint by September 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 19, 2021. (lccjn2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/24/2021. (zcal)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 24, 2021 by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 11, 2021. (lccjn2)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 11, 2021. (lccjn2)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2131. (Nelson, Justin) (Main Document 43 replaced on 8/12/2021) (zeg).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2130. (Nelson, Justin) (Main Document 42 replaced on 8/12/2021) (zeg).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Motion to Dismiss; Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2021 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion #22 taken under advisement. Further Order and Opinion to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. (zcal)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rodney A. Smolla, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8551580. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rodney A. Smolla, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing RESET for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge Carl J. Nichols. Note Location Change. (zcal)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Smolla, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Rodney A. Smolla is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2021. (lccjn2)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing RESET for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. Note Location Change. (zcal)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcal)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on the #22 Motion, as well as the pending Motions in US Dominion, Inc. v. Giuliani, 1:21-cv-00213, and US Dominion, Inc. v. My Pillow, Inc., 1:21-cv-00445, is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on June 24, 2021, in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 7, 2021. (lccjn2)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to opposition to motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Joseph, Lawrence)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Memorandum in opposition to re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Meier, Megan)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs' #38 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Response to Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss by May 3, 2021. Defendants may file their Reply by May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 5/3/2021. Defendant Reply due by 5/24/2021. (zcal)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 4/19/2021. Defense Reply due by 5/10/2021. (zcal)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisha Barron on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Barron, Elisha)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Fowler on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Fowler, Brittany)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Davida Brook on behalf of DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (Brook, Davida)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Shackelford, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shackelford, Stephen)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Response to Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss by April 19, 2021. Defendants may file their Reply by May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 2, 2021. (lccjn2)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Cronin, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Emily Cronin is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 1, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson; Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is DENIED for failure to satisfy the requirements of Local Rule 7(o)(2)" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson; Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is DENIED for failure to satisfy the requirements of Local Rule 7(o)(2)" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Cronin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8339935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Cronin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Shackelford, Jr., and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Stephen Shackelford, Jr., is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Davida Brook, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Davida Brook is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen E. Morrissey, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Stephen E. Morrissey is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brittany Fowler, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brittany Fowler is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elisha Barron, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Elisha Barron is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2021. (lccjn2)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to oppose and to reply in support of motion to dismiss by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brittany Fowler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332788. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany Fowler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Cronin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332770. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Cronin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elisha Barron, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332755. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elisha Barron, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen E. Morrissey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332731. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen E. Morrissey, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Davida Brook, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332715. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Davida Brook, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen Shackelford, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8332694. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Shackelford, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Nelson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nelson, Justin)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Memo, #3 Exhibit Exhibits)(Joseph, Lawrence)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-00445. (Clare, Thomas)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson; Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is DENIED for failure to satisfy the requirements of Local Rule 7(o)(2)" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Kleinhendler on behalf of SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C. (Kleinhendler, Howard)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint by March 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 10, 2021. (lccjn2)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Defendants' #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Howard Kleinhendler, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Howard Kleinhendler is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 10, 2021. (lccjn2)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC.. (Clare, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Notice of Appearance; emailed to jbinnall@harveybinnall.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Not an active member of this Court's Bar. Renewal needed: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal (zeg, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Response to motion; emailed to tom@clarelocke.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Not an active member of this Court's Bar. Renewal needed: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal (zeg, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Howard Kleinhendler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8177393. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration HK Decl, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Binnall on behalf of DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC. (Binnall, Jesse)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #14 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in a non-fillable PDF and with case number. (eg)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Binnall on behalf of DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC. (Binnall, Jesse) Modified on 2/8/2021 (eg).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson, Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 7(o)(2)". Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 2/5/2021. (zeg)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson; Motion. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(o)(2)". Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Joseph on behalf of All Defendants (Joseph, Lawrence)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Andrew Pusch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pusch, Dustin)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021 (Clare, Thomas)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SIDNEY POWELL, P.C. served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021 (Clare, Thomas)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SIDNEY POWELL served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021 (Clare, Thomas)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Lambart Meier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meier, Megan)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-00213. (Clare, Thomas)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 19, 2021. (lccjn2)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC., SIDNEY POWELL, SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC., US DOMINION, INC. (adh, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8052122) filed by US DOMINION, INC., DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 80, #80 Exhibit 81, #81 Exhibit 82, #82 Exhibit 83, #83 Exhibit 84, #84 Exhibit 85, #85 Exhibit 86, #86 Exhibit 87, #87 Exhibit 88, #88 Exhibit 89, #89 Exhibit 90, #90 Exhibit 91, #91 Exhibit 92, #92 Exhibit 93, #93 Exhibit 94, #94 Exhibit 95, #95 Exhibit 96, #96 Exhibit 97, #97 Exhibit 98, #98 Exhibit 99, #99 Exhibit 100, #100 Exhibit 101, #101 Exhibit 102, #102 Exhibit 103, #103 Exhibit 104, #104 Exhibit 105, #105 Exhibit 106, #106 Exhibit 107, #107 Notice to Counsel/Party of Filing Audio/Video Exhibits, #108 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure, #109 Civil Cover Sheet, #110 Summons to Sidney Powell, #111 Summons to Sidney Powell, P.C., #112 Summons Defending the Republic, Inc., #113 Exhibit 79, pt.1, #114 Exhibit 79 pt.2)(Clare, Thomas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US DOMINION, INC. et al v. POWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Represented By: Megan Lambart Meier
Represented By: Dustin Andrew Pusch
Represented By: Elisha Barron
Represented By: Florence Chen
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Sammons
Represented By: Stephen Shackelford, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany Fowler
Represented By: Davida Brook
Represented By: Jordan Mikhail Rux, I
Represented By: Justin A. Nelson
Represented By: Laranda Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US DOMINION, INC.
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Represented By: Megan Lambart Meier
Represented By: Dustin Andrew Pusch
Represented By: Elisha Barron
Represented By: Florence Chen
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Sammons
Represented By: Stephen Shackelford, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany Fowler
Represented By: Davida Brook
Represented By: Jordan Mikhail Rux, I
Represented By: Justin A. Nelson
Represented By: Laranda Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Represented By: Megan Lambart Meier
Represented By: Dustin Andrew Pusch
Represented By: Elisha Barron
Represented By: Florence Chen
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Sammons
Represented By: Stephen Shackelford, Jr.
Represented By: Laranda Walker
Represented By: Brittany Fowler
Represented By: Davida Brook
Represented By: Jordan Mikhail Rux, I
Represented By: Justin A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENDING THE REPUBLIC, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Represented By: Jesse R Binnall
Represented By: Marc Jason Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY POWELL, P.C.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY POWELL
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?