COMMUNITY FOR CREATIVE NON-VIOLENCE v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY FOR CREATIVE NON-VIOLENCE
Defendant: EMILY W. MURPHY, ALEX M. AZAR, II and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00044
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: STANDARD ORDER was entered in error and was subsequently filed in the correct case. (zjch)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2021. (lcdlf3) Modified on 2/22/2021 (zjch).
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/28/2021 (Kiernan, Paul)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, EMILY W. MURPHY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Peterson, Benton)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/12/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/13/2021. (Kiernan, Paul)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, EMILY W. MURPHY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 8, 2021. (lcdlf3)
January 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, QUIET TITLE, DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, GSA, JEFFREY A. ROSEN, US ATTORNEY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8054082) filed by COMMUNITY FOR CREATIVE NON-VIOLENCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons re Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons Emily W. Murphy, Administrator of the General Services Administration, #5 Summons Michael R. Sherwin, #6 Summons Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting Attorney General)(Kiernan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMUNITY FOR CREATIVE NON-VIOLENCE v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY W. MURPHY
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY FOR CREATIVE NON-VIOLENCE
Represented By: Paul J. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?