GREEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: VANESSA GREEN
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS and COOK INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2021cv00083
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Receipt of Electronic Transfer; Other Court Number 1:21-cv-6364- RLY- TAB sent by the Southern District of Indiana. (ztnr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Indiana pursuant to the Court Order entered 3/5/2021; Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-128) dated 3/5/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard L. Young for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2570) (ztnr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Maglio, Altom)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Maglio, Altom)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Maglio, Altom)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Maglio, Altom)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Maglio, Altom)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by VANESSA GREEN re Order to Show Cause,,,,,, filed by VANESSA GREEN. (Maglio, Altom)
January 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 2/3/2021. (tb)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff, who lives in the District of Columbia, brings this personal injury diversity action against Defendants associated with the manufacture and distribution of a surgical device. (Compl. para. 1-7, 11.) The Defendants are not located in or incorporated in the District of Columbia. (Id. para. 2-7.) Plaintiff alleges that she sought treatment in Washington, D.C. and that she had a CT scan at MedStar Washington Hospital Center after which she was informed of an injury allegedly caused by the device. (Id. para. 1, 27-28.) These are the only facts she proffers regarding Washington, D.C. She alleges that the device was implanted at Inova Fairfax Hospital, but she did not state the location of the hospital. (Compl. para. 15, 26.) In her complaint, however, Plaintiff contends that venue is proper in the District of Columbia because the device was "marketed, sold, and implanted in the District of Columbia." (Id. para. 12.) A review of the Inova Fairfax Hospital's website appears to show locations solely in Virginia. In light of this apparent discrepancy, by 2/3/21 Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this court should not transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Plaintiff's response shall include specific facts supporting venue in the District of Columbia, as her assertion that Defendants "committed tortious acts within the District of Columbia," (Compl. para. 10), is not sufficient to establish that "a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred" in Washington, D.C. See 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/27/21. (DJS)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by VANESSA GREEN. Case related to Case No. 1:14-ml-025. (Maglio, Altom)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8061429) filed by VANESSA GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Med Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #5 Summons Cook Medical LLC, #6 Summons William Cook)(Maglio, Altom)
January 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA GREEN
Represented By: Altom M. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?