HESTER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: YVETTE HESTER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00098
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 2/9/2021 (zjf)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/10/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2021. (zjf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/09/2021. (zjf)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/25/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
January 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion #2 for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall randomly assign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/12/21.(psu1)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by YVETTE HESTER (zsb)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by YVETTE HESTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(zsb)
January 8, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/08/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HESTER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVETTE HESTER
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?