SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE and DECLAN A. GALLI
Defendant: SECRETARY OF EDUCATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Petitioner: RATIO CHRISTI, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00169
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by SECRETARY OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by RATIO CHRISTI, INC.. (Bowman, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by DECLAN A. GALLI, SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE. (Katskee, Richard)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #14 is GRANTED. Defendants must respond to the motion to intervene #6 by March 18, 2021. Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing #15 is also GRANTED. Since it is not clear at this time what the status of the matter will be 21 days after the filing of a responsive pleading, or what schedule will be necessary or appropriate at that time, briefing of the motion for partial summary judgment #12 will be held in abeyance pending further order of the Court. Finally, the Court reminds the parties that the Local Rules require 12-point font, even in footnotes. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/4/2021. (lcabj1)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by SECRETARY OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by SECRETARY OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Rachael)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE under LCvR 7(m) by RATIO CHRISTI, INC. re #6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant (Bowman, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DECLAN A. GALLI, SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration Gouzoules Declaration, #3 Exhibit Gouzoules Decl. Ex. A, #4 Declaration Bolling Declaration, #5 Declaration Galli Declaration, #6 Declaration Bass Declaration, #7 Declaration Rajeshnarayanan Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katskee, Richard)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Gouzoules on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gouzoules, Alexander)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General Feb. 5, 2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SECRETARY OF EDUCATION served on 2/8/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 2/4/2021 (Katskee, Richard)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Lynn Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (Westmoreland, Rachael)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Gill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gill, Alison)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Bowman on behalf of RATIO CHRISTI, INC. (Bowman, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by RATIO CHRISTI, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Exhibit A: Declaration of Corey Miller, #3 Exhibit 1: Ratio Christi Homepage, #4 Exhibit 2: Ratio Christi About, #5 Exhibit 3: List of Chapters, #6 Exhibit 4: Statement of Faith Beliefs, #7 Exhibit 5: Statement of Human Sexuality, #8 Exhibit 6: University of Colorado, Colorado Springs Ratio Christi Student Chapter Constitution, #9 Exhibit 7: Complaint, Ratio Christi of Kennesaw State Univ. v. Olens, #10 Exhibit 8: Settlement Agreement, Ratio Christi of Kennesaw State Univ. v. Olens, #11 Exhibit 9: Complaint, Ratio Christi at Univ. of Colo., Colo. Springs v. Sharkey, #12 Exhibit 10: Settlement Agreement, Ratio Christi at Univ. of Colo., Colo. Springs v. Sharkey, #13 Exhibit 11: Christian Legal Society at the University of Iowa College of Law, Comment & Attached Chart of Religious Groups, #14 Exhibit 12: E. Scott Martin, Chi Alpha Campus Ministries U.S.A., Comment & Attached Amicus Brief of Religious Groups, #15 Exhibit 13: Corey Miller, Comment, #16 Exhibit 14: Weslee Green, Comment, #17 Exhibit B: Proposed Answer to Complaint, #18 Exhibit C: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Matthew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to SECRETARY OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Blackwell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blackwell, Geoffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Girard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Girard, Bradley)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DECLAN A. GALLI, SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE (Katskee, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8094690), CIVIL COVER SHEET by SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE, DECLAN A. GALLI, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE, DECLAN A. GALLI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Department of Education, #3 Summons Secretary of Education, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Katskee, Richard)
January 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECULAR STUDENT ALLIANCE
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Bradley Girard
Represented By: Geoffrey Blackwell
Represented By: Alison Gill
Represented By: Alexander Gouzoules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DECLAN A. GALLI
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Bradley Girard
Represented By: Geoffrey Blackwell
Represented By: Alison Gill
Represented By: Alexander Gouzoules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RATIO CHRISTI, INC.
Represented By: Matthew S. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?