ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al v. COCHRAN
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC. doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL, ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK doing business as ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS SANTA ROSA HEALTHCARE doing business as CHRISTUS SPOHN HOSPITAL CORPUS CHRISTI doing business as CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL doing business as SCHUMPERT MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ST. FRANCES CABRINI HOSPITAL, PENN STATE HEALTH doing business as MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY doing business as THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ERLANGER MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly doing business as UNIVERSITY OF LOUISVILLE HOSPITAL, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF CENTRAL GEORGIA, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL and PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00188
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHRISTUS HEALTH, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC., SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHRISTUS HEALTH, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC., SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
March 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. (dot)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By or before March 22, 2021, the parties shall submit a joint status report indicating the parties' positions on the question of relatedness given the recent status conference that occurred in In re Allina II-Type Cases, Case No. 19-mc-190-ABJ (D.D.C.). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 18, 2021. (lcckk1)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Notice of Related Case filed by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHRISTUS HEALTH, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC., SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NORRIS COCHRAN. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Orloff, Serena)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of NORRIS COCHRAN (Orloff, Serena)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/25/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/2021. (Webster, Stephanie)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NORRIS COCHRAN served on 1/28/2021 (Webster, Stephanie)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/2021. (DM)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NORRIS COCHRAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, CHRISTUS HEALTH, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC., ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC., SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORRIS COCHRAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8106166) filed by PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC., VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK, NAVICENT HEALTH, INC., PENN STATE HEALTH, TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE, WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL, ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC., UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CHRISTUS HEALTH, ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL, CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al v. COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LUKE'S HEALTH NETWORK, INC. doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE NETWORK doing business as ALBERT EINSTEIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH doing business as CHRISTUS SANTA ROSA HEALTHCARE doing business as CHRISTUS SPOHN HOSPITAL CORPUS CHRISTI doing business as CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL doing business as SCHUMPERT MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ST. FRANCES CABRINI HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENN STATE HEALTH doing business as MILTON S. HERSHEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY doing business as THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHATTANOOGA-HAMILTON COUNTY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY doing business as ERLANGER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. formerly doing business as UNIVERSITY OF LOUISVILLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAVICENT HEALTH, INC. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF CENTRAL GEORGIA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as TUFTS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNY HEALTHSCIENCE CENTER AT SYRACUSE
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNESBORO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as PUNXSUTAWNEY AREA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?