FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS
Defendant: ACTING ATTORNEY GENE JEFFREY A. ROSEN, COLONEL KARL JANSEN, ACTING U S. ATTORNE MICHAEL R SHERWIN, ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and KARL JANSEN
Petitioner: ENBRIDGE ENERGY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00189
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #18 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/21. (lcckk3)
March 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/21. (lcckk3)
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Learner, Howard)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant U.S. Army Corps of Engineers' #16 Motion to Consolidate. Defendant indicates that Plaintiff opposes the motion. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file its opposition by no later than MARCH 19, 2021 and Defendant to file its reply by MARCH 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/5/21. (lcckk3)
March 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition due by 3/19/2021; Defendant's Reply due by 3/26/2021. (kt)
March 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #16 due by 3/19/2021. Defendants' Reply to #16 due by 3/26/2021. (dot)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by KARL JANSEN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gange, Heather)
March 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather E. Gange on behalf of KARL JANSEN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Gange, Heather)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS re #13 Amended Complaint . (Strand, Scott)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KARL JANSEN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS filed by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Strand, Scott)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS . (Strand, Scott)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/09/2021. (DM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Strand on behalf of FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS (Strand, Scott)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Petoskey on behalf of FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS (Petoskey, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION Regarding Local Rules by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Petoskey, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION Regarding Local Rules by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Strand, Scott)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Simonson, #4 Appearance of Counsel - Sibley, #5 Appearance of Counsel - Duncan, #6 Appearance of Counsel - Brown, #7 Rule 26.1 Certificate)(Sibley, George)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 , #5 Motions for Admission of Attorneys Pro Hac Vice with respect to Scott Strand and John Petoskey, in order for them to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs, CONTINGENT on said attorneys filing declarations certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than FEBRUARY 5, 2021. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/21. (lcckk3)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Petoskey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8109743. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order John Petoskey PHV)(Learner, Howard)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KARL JANSEN, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott Strand, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8105532. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Learner, Howard)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-03817. (Learner, Howard)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8105266) filed by FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons for Jansen, #9 Summons Summons for Sherwin, #10 Summons Summons for USACE, #11 Summons Summons for Rosen)(Learner, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING ATTORNEY GENE JEFFREY A. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONEL KARL JANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING U S. ATTORNE MICHAEL R SHERWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL JANSEN
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF THE HEADWATERS
Represented By: Howard A. Learner
Represented By: Scott Strand
Represented By: John Petoskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ENBRIDGE ENERGY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: George P. Sibley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?