FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC and ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00217
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by George G. Gordon on behalf of ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Gordon, George)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/2021. (lcrcl3)
March 10, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Chapman on behalf of ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Chapman, Julia)
March 5, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen N. Walker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8283680. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Lefkowitz, Jay)
March 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Cheever on behalf of AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC (Cheever, Kara)
March 5, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Devora Allon on behalf of AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC (Allon, Devora)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/3/2021. (lcrcl3)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/3/2021. (lcrcl3)
March 2, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kara Eileen Cheever by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC re #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kara Eileen Cheever, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8262439. Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
March 2, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Devora W. Allon by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC re #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Devora W. Allon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8262398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kara Eileen Cheever, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8262439. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(Lefkowitz, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Devora W. Allon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8262398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(Lefkowitz, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Philip Lefkowitz on behalf of AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC (Lefkowitz, Jay)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to replace the redacted complaint filed January 25, 2021 #3 with the revised redacted complaint attached as Exhibit A [13-1] to the Second Joint Stipulation #13 . It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall maintain the unredacted complaint under seal absent further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2021. (lcrcl3)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answers due by 4/26/2021. FTC's oppositions to any motions to dismiss due by 6/10/2021. Defendants' replies to any oppositions to motions to dismiss due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2021. (lcrcl3)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2021. (lcrcl3)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2021. (lcrcl3)
February 23, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hageman, Eric)
February 23, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Meier, Markus)
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 4/25/2021. (Meier, Markus)
February 22, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Meier, Markus)
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Meier, Markus)
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julia Chapman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8215730. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hageman, Eric)
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- George G. Gordon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-8215719. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hageman, Eric)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Second Joint Stipulation Concerning Sealing Portions of the Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Monahan, Kara)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Hageman on behalf of ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Hageman, Eric)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Concerning Sealing Portions of the Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Monahan, Kara)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harris Weingarten on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Weingarten, James)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Powers Dick on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Dick, Emma)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Richard Towey on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Towey, Jamie)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Matthew Sprague on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Sprague, Eric)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Lee Monahan on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Monahan, Kara)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth W. Huston on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Huston, Garth)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan J Cartagena on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cartagena, Evan)
January 25, 2021 Summons (4) Issued as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC. (zjf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 REDACTED COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Temporarily Under Sea filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 01/25/2021.(zjf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Exparte document, MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Temporarily Under Seal by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Represented By: Kara Cheever
Represented By: Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Represented By: Devora Allon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: Kara Cheever
Represented By: Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Represented By: Devora Allon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Represented By: Eric Dean Hageman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: George G. Gordon
Represented By: Julia Chapman
Represented By: Eric Dean Hageman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Eric Matthew Sprague
Represented By: Kara Lee Monahan
Represented By: James Harris Weingarten
Represented By: Garth W. Huston
Represented By: Markus H. Meier
Represented By: Evan J Cartagena
Represented By: Emma Powers Dick
Represented By: Jamie Richard Towey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?