THOMPSON v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: BENNIE G. THOMPSON, MARCIA KAPTUR, HENRY C. JOHNSON, KAREN R. BASS, BONNIE WATSON COLEMAN, MAXINE WATERS, PRAMILA JAYAPAL, VERONICA ESCOBAR, JERROLD NADLER, STEPHEN I COHEN and BARBARA J. LEE
Defendant: OATH KEEPERS, PROUD BOYS INTERNATIONAL, L.L.C., DONALD J. TRUMP, RUDOLPH W. GIULIANI, ENRIQUE TARRIO and WARBOYS LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00400
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ENRIQUE TARRIO, WARBOYS LLC. (eg)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by BENNIE G. THOMPSON, BONNIE WATSON COLEMAN, KAREN R. BASS, PRAMILA JAYAPAL, MAXINE WATERS, JERROLD NADLER, HENRY C. JOHNSON, STEPHEN I COHEN, BARBARA J. LEE, VERONICA ESCOBAR, MARCIA KAPTUR.(Sellers, Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B) permits a plaintiff to amend his pleading once as a matter of right up to 21 days after a defendant has served a responsive pleading or motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f). No defendant has yet filed a responsive pleading or motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff timely seeks to amend his pleading as a matter of right. The Amended Complaint therefore will be the operative pleading in this case. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by May 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/7/2021. (lcapm3)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extesntion of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by OATH KEEPERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, Kerry) Modified event title on 3/25/2021 (znmw).
March 23, 2021 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant Oathkeepers shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than April 26, 2021. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 3/23/2021. (lcapm3)
March 16, 2021 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Mr. Trump shall file his answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than April 26, 2021. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 3/16/2021. (lcapm3)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Binnall on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Binnall, Jesse)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OATH KEEPERS served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021 (Corman, Brian)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021 (Corman, Brian)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE. RUDOLPH W. GIULIANI waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Corman, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to RUDOLPH W. GIULIANI, OATH KEEPERS, PROUD BOYS INTERNATIONAL, L.L.C., DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Christopher Corman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Corman, Brian)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) by BENNIE G. THOMPSON re #1 Complaint, filed by BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Sellers, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8202743) filed by BENNIE G. THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Sellers, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to mbekesha@judicialwatch.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, ) Modified to enter in error on 2/17/2021; filed in wrong case. (adh, ).
February 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OATH KEEPERS
Represented By: Kerry Lee Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROUD BOYS INTERNATIONAL, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Jesse R Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDOLPH W. GIULIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE TARRIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARBOYS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE G. THOMPSON
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Brian Christopher Corman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA KAPTUR
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY C. JOHNSON
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN R. BASS
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE WATSON COLEMAN
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE WATERS
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRAMILA JAYAPAL
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA ESCOBAR
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERROLD NADLER
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN I COHEN
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA J. LEE
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?