BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL et al v. COCHRAN et al
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC., THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA doing business as CHRISTUS HIGHLAND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHRISTUS HEALTH SHREVEPORT - BOSSIER, GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION doing business as MACNEAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL CHICAGO, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH RESURRECTION MEDICAL CENTER CHICAGO, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER CHICAGO, ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as OSF HEALTHCARE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER agent of OSF LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as BOURBAN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, ALL PLAINTIFFS and UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN and ELIZABETH RICHTER
Case Number: 1:2021cv00513
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Glazer, Joseph)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NORRIS COCHRAN, ELIZABETH RICHTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #5 Joint Motion to Enter Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and any stipulation of facts shall be filed on or before March 22, 2021; defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion shall be filed on or before April 2, 2021; and plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed on or before April 5, 2021. It is further ORDERED that defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending resolution of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/21. (lcrjl1)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC., ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Stipulated by the Parties, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Joseph)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule , MOTION to Expedite by ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC., ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Joseph)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of All Defendants (Simon, Jeremy)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NORRIS COCHRAN, ELIZABETH RICHTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC., ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER (Glazer, Joseph)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8251532) filed by PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC., ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK, GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Administrator CMS, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Secretary HHS, #5 Summons United States Attorney)(Glazer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL et al v. COCHRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AMITA HEALTH ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVENTIST MIDWEST HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTUS HEALTH NORTHERN LOUISIANA doing business as CHRISTUS HIGHLAND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHRISTUS HEALTH SHREVEPORT - BOSSIER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOTTLIEB COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION doing business as MACNEAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWESTERN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL CHICAGO
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH RESURRECTION MEDICAL CENTER CHICAGO
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESENCE CHICAGO HOSPITALS NETWORK doing business as AMITA HEALTH SAINTS MARY AND ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER CHICAGO
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM doing business as OSF HEALTHCARE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER agent of OSF LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOURBON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as BOURBAN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as GEORGETOWN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH RICHTER
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?