UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA v. GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC
Petitioner: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Respondent: GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00922
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/22/2021. (kt)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 27, 2021. (lcckk1)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA. (Bolek, Keith)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 ENTERRED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Keith R. Bolek on behalf of UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA (Bolek, Keith) Modified on 5/19/2021 (eg).
May 19, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #12 Notice of Appearance was entered in error per counsel request. (eg)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award by GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Arbitrator Award, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Alan Smithe, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Vitarelli on behalf of GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC (Vitarelli, Richard)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 26, 2021. (lcckk1)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 26, 2021. (lcckk1)
April 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent to file a responsive pleading to #1 by 5/18/2021. (dot)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for in structions Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 26, 2021. (lcckk1)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam C. Doerr, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8396370. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Doerr Declaration)(Silvestri, Stephen)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard F. Vitarelli, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8396356. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Vitarellii Declaration)(Silvestri, Stephen)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition by GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Stephen) Modified event on 4/26/2021 (ztd).
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021 (Bolek, Keith)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/2021. (DM) (zdot).
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration Exhibit 2)(Bolek, Keith)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8352314) filed by UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bolek, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA v. GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Represented By: Keith R. Bolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEMMA POWER SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Richard Vitarelli
Represented By: Stephen M. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?