CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS and SECRETARY OF DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2021cv01045
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Atwood, Amy)
June 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zjf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Atwood, Amy)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/29/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Atwood, Amy)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 4/26/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Atwood, Amy) Modified on 6/9/2021 (zjf).
May 31, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Camila Cossio, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8491543. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atwood, Amy)
May 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 7/28/2021. (mac)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SECRETARY OF DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Hao-Chin)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hao-Chin Hubert Yang on behalf of All Defendants (Yang, Hao-Chin)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than July 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/20/2021. (lcegs2)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/28/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECRETARY OF DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-884. (Atwood, Amy)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Atwood, Amy)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECRETARY OF DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8376092) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Atwood, Amy)
April 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Amy R. Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?