DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. VIZION ONE, INC.
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: VIZION ONE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01071
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIZION ONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Temple, Donald)
June 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/11/2021. Joint Report due by 6/1/2021. (tb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Jones on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Jones, Jennifer)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Jones, Jennifer)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by VIZION ONE, INC.. (Temple, Donald)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #8 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall file its opposition to the motion to remand by 6/11/21. Going forward, all proposed orders shall include the dates for all proposed extended deadlines. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/1/21. (DJS)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties' joint status on the relevance of the 5/18/21 D.C. Court of Appeals Decision shall be filed by 6/1/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/28/21. (DJS) Modified on 6/1/2021 (tb).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the 5/24/2021 Status Report filed by the parties in related case VIZION ONE, INC. v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (14-cv-883), it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint notice setting forth their positions on the extent to which, if any, the 5/18/21 D.C. Court of Appeals Decision attached to the notice impacts the present case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/28/21. (DJS)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt on 5/25/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 000675 B. (ztd)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jackson, Catherine)
April 26, 2021 RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Anne Jackson on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Jackson, Catherine).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/3/2021. (znmw) Modified on 5/13/2021 (znmw).
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Jackson, Catherine)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Anne Jackson on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Jackson, Catherine)
April 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: By 4/23/2021 Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry, and by that same date, Plaintiff shall also file a Notice informing the court of the date by which Defendant's answer is due. (jth)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 4/23/21 Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. By that same date, Plaintiff shall also file a Notice informing the court of the date by which Defendant's answer is due. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/20/21. (DJS)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Case related to Case No. 14-cv-883. (adh, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from US District Court for DC, case number 14-cv-00883 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8385097 filed by VIZION ONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice Related Cases, #3 Exhibit DC Superior Court Complaint)(Temple, Donald)
April 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. VIZION ONE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Jennifer C. Jones
Represented By: Catherine Anne Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIZION ONE, INC.
Represented By: Donald M. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?