BROWN et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: E. F., ROBERT A CHAPMAN, OREN D. GINGRICH, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, TERRY FLOOD, JR, JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, K. L., WAYNE C. HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, ROGER A. LOBATO, A. S., CHRISTINE TURNEY, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, MARIA CHAPMAN, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING, RYAN HERMANCE, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, LONNIE J. TURNEY, DAVID RAMIREZ, JOSEPH TURNEY, PIERRE L. JONES, CEDRIC M. BROWN, JOSHUA W. FISHER, KAYLA CHAPMAN, ALLEN P. WALLACE, BRANDON TURNEY, DEBORAH HERMANCE, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, TERRY D. FLOOD, BROOK A COLBERT, C. F., EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, ROBERT A. CHAPMAN and BROOK A. COLBERT
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv01308
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 6/16/2021, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (eg)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST from CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A. CHAPMAN, BROOK A. COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING. for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (eg)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A. CHAPMAN, BROOK A. COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING. (Lakin, Bradley)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (eg)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #7 Memorandum, the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-issue Summons for Defendant Islamic Republic of Iran using ECF No. 7-1. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/21/2021. (lctnm3)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A CHAPMAN, BROOK A COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Lakin, Bradley)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A CHAPMAN, BROOK A COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lakin, Bradley)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Addresses Under Seal. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/13/2021. (lctnm3)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/13/2021. (lctnm3)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
May 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Addresses Under Seal by CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A CHAPMAN, BROOK A COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lakin, Bradley)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Designation of Related Civil Cases by CEDRIC M. BROWN, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, HAYDEN CHAPMAN, KAYLA CHAPMAN, MARIA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A CHAPMAN, BROOK A COLBERT, C. F., E. F., JOSHUA W. FISHER, TERRY D. FLOOD, TERRY FLOOD, JR, OREN D. GINGRICH, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DEBORAH HERMANCE, MELISSA HERMANCE, RYAN HERMANCE, WAYNE C. HERMANCE, PIERRE L. JONES, K. L., ROGER A. LOBATO, MICHAEL S NIMTZ, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, DAVID RAMIREZ, EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, A. S., JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, BRANDON TURNEY, CHRISTINE TURNEY, JOSEPH TURNEY, LONNIE J. TURNEY, OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, ALLEN P. WALLACE, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING re #1 Complaint,,, (Lakin, Bradley)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8444540) filed by OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO, JOSEPH TURNEY, K. L., BROOK A COLBERT, JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER, RYAN HERMANCE, ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ, CEDRIC M. BROWN, MELISSA HERMANCE, BRANDON TURNEY, DEBORAH HERMANCE, A. S., EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA, DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR, ROGER A. LOBATO, FABRICIO GONZALEZ, DAVID RAMIREZ, TERRY FLOOD, JR, CHRISTINE TURNEY, ALLEN P. WALLACE, C. F., MICHAEL S NIMTZ, OREN D. GINGRICH, DANNY T. PERRY, JR, LONNIE J. TURNEY, KAYLA CHAPMAN, ROBERT A CHAPMAN, STACEY A. ROCHESTER, TERRY D. FLOOD, E. F., WAYNE C. HERMANCE, JOSHUA W. FISHER, MARIA CHAPMAN, SUZANNE W. WALLACE, TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING, PIERRE L. JONES, HAYDEN CHAPMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lakin, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. F.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A CHAPMAN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OREN D. GINGRICH
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY A. ROCHESTER
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY FLOOD, JR
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN L. SHELLHAMMER
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAYDEN CHAPMAN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. L.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE C. HERMANCE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA HERMANCE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY T. PERRY, JR
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR G. VAZQUEZ CORDERO
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE W. WALLACE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER A. LOBATO
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE TURNEY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFREDO L. CASULA ANPUNEZ
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABRICIO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRELAIN ALLEN WHITING
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN HERMANCE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S NIMTZ
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE J. TURNEY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RAMIREZ
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH TURNEY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE L. JONES
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC M. BROWN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA W. FISHER
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA CHAPMAN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN P. WALLACE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON TURNEY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH HERMANCE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL C. SHEPHERD, JR
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY D. FLOOD
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOK A COLBERT
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. F.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. RAMOS SANTA
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. CHAPMAN
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOK A. COLBERT
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?