DOLAN v. BAKER et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN DOLAN
Defendant: ANDREW ESPOSITO, SUSAN MARINELLI, MARSHA BAKER, JOHN MCCABE and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01348
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number: 200059. (eg)
June 23, 2021 Summons (5) Issued as to MARSHA BAKER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ANDREW ESPOSITO, SUSAN MARINELLI, JOHN MCCABE. (eg)
June 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On May 19, 2021, this Court issued a Minute Order directing plaintiff either to submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402 filing fee in full. Plaintiff submitted a timely response, ECF No. 9, which does not comply with the Minute Order. Review of the docket confirmed that no filing fee has been paid to this Court or to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York prior to transfer of this action. It is hereby ORDERED that, within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff pay the $402 filing fee in full, or, alternatively, shall file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Minute Order, the Court may dismiss the complaint and this civil action without prejudice. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 7, 2021. (psu2)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 05/19/2021 Minute Order, filed by KEVIN DOLAN. (zsb)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York transferred this action to this Court without requiring payment of the filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914 or granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Within 30 days from the entry date of this order, plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee applicable to this civil action or file an IFP motion. Failure to do either will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. The Clerk shall enclose with this order an IFP form application, which plaintiff may complete or use as a guide. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/19/2021.(psu1)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04078. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 10, 2021 Mailed a copy of #7 Order, to Kevin Dolan at 11 Middle Branch Lane, Brewster, NY 10509. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/7/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to District of Columbia, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Judge John McCabe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Esposito, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Veronica S. Marinelli, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marsha Baker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marsha Baker, District of Columbia, Andrew Esposito, Susan Marinelli, John McCabe. Document filed by Kevin Dolan. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOLAN v. BAKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW ESPOSITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN MARINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHA BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCCABE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN DOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?