CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Intervenor Defendant: WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH and UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv01506
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(zjf) Modified event and link on 7/29/2021 (znmw).
July 27, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH.(zjf) Modified event and link on 7/29/2021 (znmw).
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Tucci, Todd)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. It is ORDERED that movant Washington County, Utah's motion to intervene #4 and movant Utah Department of Transportation's motion to intervene #5 are GRANTED. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/27/21. (lcabj2)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene , #4 MOTION to Intervene filed by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bosshardt, Stacey)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Regenold on behalf of UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Regenold, Stephanie)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 #12 Motions for Leave of David J. Miller and Eric Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of each lawyer's firm or office, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/21. (DMK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric Clarke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8605444. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Clarke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiland, Paul)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Miller, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8605241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Miller, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiland, Paul)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Intervene , #4 MOTION to Intervene filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucci, Todd)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Kim on behalf of All Defendants (Kim, Joseph)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 ERRATA Proposed Answer in Support of Motion to Intervene by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Bosshardt, Stacey)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION . (Bosshardt, Stacey) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/2/2021) (zjf). Modified event on 7/2/2021 (znmw).
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Bosshardt on behalf of UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Bosshardt, Stacey) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/2/2021) (zjf).
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Manwill, #2 Declaration of Naomi Kisen, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bosshardt, Stacey)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer, #2 Declaration of Cameron Rogan, #3 Declaration of Paul Weiland and Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Paul Weiland, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Paul Weiland, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiland, Paul)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
June 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WILDERNESS SOCIETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE re #1 Complaint,, filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE.
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8500456) filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant Department of the Interior, #3 Summons for Defendant Bureau of Land Management)(Tucci, Todd)
June 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to ttucci@advocateswest.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSERVE SOUTHWEST UTAH
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDERNESS SOCIETY
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Todd C. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: WASHINGTON COUNTY, UTAH
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: UTAH DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Stacey Bosshardt
Represented By: Stephanie Regenold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?