MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Plaintiff: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: MARITIME ADMINISTRATION and DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Petitioner: APL MARITIME, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01606
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION (Borson, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants and Intervenor-Defendant shall file their responses to the complaint on or before August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/02/2021. (lcrdm3)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARITIME ADMINISTRATION served on 6/21/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 6/25/2021 (Wesneski, Joshua)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/14/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/22/2021. (Wesneski, Joshua)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of APL Maritime, Ltd.'s unopposed motion to intervene as a defendant, Dkt. #7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that APL Maritime, Ltd. may intervene as a defendant in this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/30/2021. (lcrdm2)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Justin Cedrone on behalf of APL MARITIME, LTD. (Cedrone, Gerard)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by APL MARITIME, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/16/2021. (lcrdm2)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Wesneski on behalf of MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Wesneski, Joshua)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-2751. (Perry, Mark)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Perry, Mark)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8523429) filed by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Civil Cover Sheet, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons)(Perry, Mark)
June 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARITIME ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Joshua M. Wesneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: APL MARITIME, LTD.
Represented By: Brian T Burgess
Represented By: Gerard Justin Cedrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?