HEAD et al v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Plaintiff: CORINE PEOPLES GORE and ALISA HEAD
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. and AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01666
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings/joinder of parties due by 9/20/2021; plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) statement due by 10/20/2021; defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) statement due by 12/20/2021; discovery due by 3/14/2022; dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2022; oppositions due by 4/29/2022; Replies due by 5/6/2022. (ztg)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, in light of the parties' #12 Joint Meet and Confer, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by September 20, 2021, any motions for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings shall be filed; (2) by October 20, 2021, plaintiff shall serve any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (3) by December 20, 2021, defendant shall file any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (4) by March 14, 2022, discovery shall close; (5) by April 15, 2022, the parties shall file any dispositive motions; (6) by April 29, 2022, the parties shall file any oppositions to dispositive motions filed; and(7) by May 6, 2022, the parties shall file any replies in support of their dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 3, 2021. (lcbah2)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Ann Thomas on behalf of AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Thomas, Lindsey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Christopher Componovo on behalf of CORINE PEOPLES GORE, ALISA HEAD (Componovo, William)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lindsey Ann Thomas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8633767. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conti, Anthony)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting defendant's #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Thomas may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendant in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 29, 2021. (lcbah2)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 Receipt on 7/15/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 001587 B. (eg)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg on behalf of CORINE PEOPLES GORE, ALISA HEAD (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC..(Conti, Anthony)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 24, 2021. (lcbah2)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
June 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 ERRATA Notice of Removal for Compliance with LCvR 5.1(c) by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Conti, Anthony)
June 22, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to tony@contifenn.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. (Conti, Anthony) Modified on 6/22/2021 to edit docket text (znmg).
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. (Conti, Anthony)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC..(Conti, Anthony)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 001587 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8543992 filed by AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Conti, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEAD et al v. AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORINE PEOPLES GORE
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Represented By: William Christopher Componovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALISA HEAD
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Represented By: William Christopher Componovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Represented By: Lindsey Ann Thomas
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?