TROUT v. SELECT GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: SYDNEY STOUT and SYDNEY TROUT
Defendant: SELECT GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01684
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before, August 30, 2021, the plaintiff shall respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 19, 2021. (lcrbw2)
August 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response due by 8/30/2021 (hs)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SYDNEY TROUT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Josephson, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel A Perez on behalf of SELECT GROUP LLC (Perez, Angel)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SELECT GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Zach Earls in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant The Select Group LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(DeCamp, Paul)
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Barrett on behalf of SELECT GROUP LLC (Barrett, Kathleen)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Josephson on behalf of SYDNEY TROUT (Josephson, Michael)
July 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/6/2021, (hs)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for Plaintiff to File Her Motion for Class Certification, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before August 6, 2021, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for the plaintiff to file a motion for class certification is VACATED pending further order of the Court at a forthcoming initial scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 29, 2021. (lcrbw2)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's #11 #12 Motions for Special Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Angel A. Perez and Kathleen Barrett, EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN, P.C. 227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3250 Chicago, IL 60606, are ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 29, 2021. (lcrbw2)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen A. Barrett, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8631179. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SELECT GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kathleen A. Barrett, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Special Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice - Kathleen A. Barrett)(DeCamp, Paul)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Angel A. Perez, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-8630214. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SELECT GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Angel A. Perez, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Special Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice - Angel A. Perez)(DeCamp, Paul)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Ashley Jones on behalf of SYDNEY TROUT (Jones, Taylor)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and for Plaintiff to File Her Motion for Class Certification by SELECT GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Joint Mtn for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer/Plead & for Plaintiff to File Mtn for Class Certification)(DeCamp, Paul)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SELECT GROUP LLC (DeCamp, Paul)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul DeCamp on behalf of SELECT GROUP LLC (DeCamp, Paul)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #5 #6 Motions for Special Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorneys referenced therein meet the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Michael A. Josephson and Taylor A. Jones, JOSEPHSON DUNLAP LLP, 11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050, Houston, Texas 77046, are ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 2, 2021. (lcrbw2)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Taylor A. Jones, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8555517. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SYDNEY TROUT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael A. Josephson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8555471. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SYDNEY TROUT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Inclusion of the following class action members: Donnie Miles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SELECT GROUP LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA by SYDNEY STOUT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8550048) filed by SYDNEY TROUT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Migliaccio, Nicholas) Modified filed by on 6/24/2021 (eg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/15/2021) (znmw).
June 23, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to nmigliaccio@classlawdc.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TROUT v. SELECT GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT GROUP LLC
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Represented By: Angel A Perez
Represented By: Kathleen Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYDNEY STOUT
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYDNEY TROUT
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Taylor Ashley Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?