LIU et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: CAO LEI, YUE CAO, ZERONG CHEN, CHENG CAI, JIANHANG CHEN, SI CHEN, YU CHEN, XIAOXU BAN, BO TAO, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, HENGYU ALI, XINYAN CHEN, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI, JIALUE CHEN, HAOYU CHEN, JINHUA CHEN, YITAO CHEN, XIN CHEN, KANGJIA CAI, JUJIE BAI, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, BIQING CAO, HAOKUN CHEN, MINHUA CAO, CHIA HUAI CHANG, YUZHE CHEN, ZHIFENG CHEN, NIYUN CHEN, XINYU CHEN, WANXIANG CAI, KONGTAO CHEN, QIWEN CHEN, BAOZHOU CAO, BIDA CHEN, SIQI CHEN, TAO CHEN, XUEYING BAI, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, YUANZHEN CAI, JIAQI CAI, XUANYU CHEN, RUIYANG CHEN, SIYING LIU, HAORAN CHEN, JIAYI CAO, TAO BO, LEI CAO and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2021cv01725
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF SELECTED PLAINTIFFS by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Kuck, Charles)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of Plaintiffs' #19 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, the August 27, 2021, hearing on the Preliminary Injunction is hereby canceled. The Government shall file a response to Plaintiff's #11 Second Amended Complaint by 9/10/2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/13/2021. (lctnm3)
August 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the #11 Second Amended Complaint due by 9/10/2021. (ztg)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Kuck, Charles)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Press, Joshua)
August 2, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2021. Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, DENIED. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
August 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; emailed to wnaser@immigration.net, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. For future filings, attorney signature must match ECF login/password. (zeg, )
July 31, 2021 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Connie L. Nolan)(Press, Joshua) Modified docket event/text on 8/2/2021 (eg).
July 30, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2021 at 4:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (USCIS Online Alerts), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Compilation of Advertisements Promoting H-1B Abuse, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Multiple Registrations Probabilities Chart, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 H-1B Abuse Online Posts, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Liu Declaration), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Plaintiffs Declarations))(Naser, Waleed)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On or before July 31, 2021, the Government shall respond to Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The parties shall appear for a telephonic hearing on the motion at 4:00 p.m. on August 2, 2021. Dial in details will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/29/2021. (lctnm1)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction requests expedited review. Defendants' opposition is due on or before August 10, 2021. Plaintiffs' reply brief, if any, is due on or before August 17, 2021. The parties shall appear for a hearing at 3:00 p.m. on August 27, 2021, in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/28/2021. (lctnm1)
July 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' opposition due by 8/10/2021. Plaintiff's reply due by 8/17/2021. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2- In Person before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 08/12/2021.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Naser, Waleed) Modified on 8/13/2021 (zeg).
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Samuel Press on behalf of All Defendants (Press, Joshua)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/12/2021. (Naser, Waleed) Modified serve date on 7/23/2021 (eg).
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (eg)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Waleed Naser on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Naser, Waleed) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/15/2021) (zeg).
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(eg)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall docket ECF No. 9-1 as Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/13/2021. (lctnm2)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by HENGYU ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, JUJIE BAI, XUEYING BAI, XIAOXU BAN, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, TAO BO, CHENG CAI, JIAQI CAI, KANGJIA CAI, WANXIANG CAI, YUANZHEN CAI, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, BAOZHOU CAO, BIQING CAO, JIAYI CAO, LEI CAO, MINHUA CAO, YUE CAO, BIDA CHEN, HAOKUN CHEN, HAORAN CHEN, HAOYU CHEN, JIALUE CHEN, JIANHANG CHEN, JINHUA CHEN, KONGTAO CHEN, NIYUN CHEN, QIWEN CHEN, RUIYANG CHEN, SI CHEN, SIQI CHEN, TAO CHEN, XIN CHEN, XINYAN CHEN, XINYU CHEN, XUANYU CHEN, YITAO CHEN, YU CHEN, YUZHE CHEN, ZERONG CHEN, ZHIFENG CHEN, CHIA HUAI CHANG, SIYING LIU, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redlined Version)(Kuck, Charles)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs have filed a second amended complaint, see ECF No. 6, but have not sought leave of the Court or provided "the opposing party's written consent" as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Plaintiffs' previous complaint, ECF No. 3, will remain operative until Plaintiffs file an amended complaint through the proper procedures. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2021. (lctnm2)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Waleed Naser is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2021. (lctnm2)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Waleed Naser, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8586496. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HENGYU ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, JUJIE BAI, XUEYING BAI, XIAOXU BAN, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, TAO BO, CHENG CAI, JIAQI CAI, KANGJIA CAI, WANXIANG CAI, YUANZHEN CAI, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, BAOZHOU CAO, BIQING CAO, JIAYI CAO, LEI CAO, MINHUA CAO, YUE CAO, BIDA CHEN, HAOKUN CHEN, HAORAN CHEN, HAOYU CHEN, JIALUE CHEN, JIANHANG CHEN, JINHUA CHEN, KONGTAO CHEN, NIYUN CHEN, QIWEN CHEN, RUIYANG CHEN, SI CHEN, SIQI CHEN, TAO CHEN, XIN CHEN, XINYAN CHEN, XINYU CHEN, XUANYU CHEN, YITAO CHEN, YU CHEN, YUZHE CHEN, ZERONG CHEN, ZHIFENG CHEN, CHIA HUAI CHANG, SIYING LIU, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI. (Kuck, Charles)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by TAO CHEN, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI, QIWEN CHEN, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, ZERONG CHEN, MINHUA CAO, KANGJIA CAI, XIAOXU BAN, YUE CAO, JUJIE BAI, BIDA CHEN, YUANZHEN CAI, NIYUN CHEN, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, ZHIFENG CHEN, SI CHEN, YU CHEN, LEI CAO, JIAQI CAI, SIQI CHEN, RUIYANG CHEN, HENGYU ALI, KONGTAO CHEN, JINHUA CHEN, CHIA HUAI CHANG, TAO BO, HAOYU CHEN, HAOKUN CHEN, CHENG CAI, XIN CHEN, JIALUE CHEN, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, WANXIANG CAI, XINYU CHEN, BIQING CAO, XUEYING BAI, JIANHANG CHEN, SIYING LIU, YITAO CHEN, BAOZHOU CAO, HAORAN CHEN, YUZHE CHEN, XUANYU CHEN, JIAYI CAO, XINYAN CHEN.(Kuck, Charles)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RUIYANG CHEN, HAOYU CHEN, LEI CAO, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, YUZHE CHEN, BAOZHOU CAO, HENGYU ALI, SIYING LIU, MINHUA CAO, JIANHANG CHEN, BIQING CAO, ZERONG CHEN, NIYUN CHEN, KONGTAO CHEN, HAORAN CHEN, YU CHEN, JIAYI CAO, WANXIANG CAI, XINYAN CHEN, CHENG CAI, XINYU CHEN, XUANYU CHEN, KANGJIA CAI, CHIA HUAI CHANG, QIWEN CHEN, JIAQI CAI, BIDA CHEN, ALL PLAINTIFFS, JIALUE CHEN, XIAOXU BAN, YITAO CHEN, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, SIQI CHEN, TAO BO, ZHIFENG CHEN, YUANZHEN CAI, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI, XIN CHEN, JUJIE BAI, SI CHEN, TAO CHEN, HAOKUN CHEN, YUE CAO, JINHUA CHEN, XUEYING BAI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Second Amended Complaint)(Kuck, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Dean Joseph on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Joseph, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2021. (lctnm2)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RUIYANG CHEN, HAOYU CHEN, LEI CAO, DARSHAN BHANUSHALI, YUZHE CHEN, BAOZHOU CAO, HENGYU ALI, SIYING LIU, MINHUA CAO, JIANHANG CHEN, BIQING CAO, ZERONG CHEN, NIYUN CHEN, KONGTAO CHEN, HAORAN CHEN, YU CHEN, JIAYI CAO, WANXIANG CAI, XINYAN CHEN, CHENG CAI, XINYU CHEN, XUANYU CHEN, KANGJIA CAI, CHIA HUAI CHANG, QIWEN CHEN, JIAQI CAI, BIDA CHEN, ALL PLAINTIFFS, JIALUE CHEN, XIAOXU BAN, YITAO CHEN, SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR, SIQI CHEN, TAO BO, ZHIFENG CHEN, YUANZHEN CAI, JORGE CALVO MARTIN, ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI, XIN CHEN, JUJIE BAI, SI CHEN, TAO CHEN, HAOKUN CHEN, YUE CAO, JINHUA CHEN, XUEYING BAI.(Kuck, Charles)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
June 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-8561906) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compilation of H-1B abusing entities, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Declarations, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons DC USA Summons, #5 Summons Mayorkas Summons, #6 Summons DHS Summons, #7 Summons USCIS Summons)(Kuck, Charles) Modified on 6/29/2021 to edit docket text (znmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIU et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAO LEI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUE CAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZERONG CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHENG CAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIANHANG CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SI CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YU CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIAOXU BAN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BO TAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARSHAN BHANUSHALI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENGYU ALI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XINYAN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIL REDDY BHIMIDI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIALUE CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAOYU CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JINHUA CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YITAO CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KANGJIA CAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUJIE BAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE CALVO MARTIN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIQING CAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAOKUN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINHUA CAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIA HUAI CHANG
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUZHE CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHIFENG CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIYUN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XINYU CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANXIANG CAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KONGTAO CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QIWEN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAOZHOU CAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIDA CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIQI CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAO CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XUEYING BAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREENIVASAN ANARAI CHANDRASEKAR
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUANZHEN CAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIAQI CAI
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XUANYU CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUIYANG CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIYING LIU
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAORAN CHEN
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIAYI CAO
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAO BO
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEI CAO
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Joseph
Represented By: Waleed Naser
Represented By: Charles Herman Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?