GENERAL MOTORS LLC v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv01767
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Collette, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
July 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Wells, David)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Wells, David)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Wells on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Wells, David)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Wray, Ron)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Coxe Mesrobian on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Mesrobian, Anne)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Collette, Matthew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Collette, Matthew)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-11340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Transfer to the District of Columbia for MDL 2925 (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17) to District of Columbia for MDL # 2925. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17) for MDL # 2925. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Azar Alexander on behalf of BNSF Railway Company. (Alexander, Azar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BNSF Railway Company served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by General Motors LLC against BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8492630 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the District of Columbia, MDL 2925, 1:20-mc-00008, Judge Beryl A. Howell] (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]
June 8, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL MOTORS LLC v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Leonid Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Anne Coxe Mesrobian
Represented By: David Matthew Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Ron Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?