MAZER v. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA A MAZER and JOSHUA A. MAZER
Not Classified By Court: MURIEL BOWSER, LAQUANDRA NESBITT and D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01782
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Mateya Beth Kelley on behalf of All Defendants (Kelley, Mateya)
August 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #25 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to ctucker@sirillp.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password for future fillings. (zeg, )
August 25, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint due by 9/10/2021. (hmc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by MURIEL E. BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the #24 Amended Complaint on or before September 10, 2021. As Defendants acknowledge, see ECF No. 26 at 1, Defendants' #20 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot given the filing of the #24 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/24/2021. (lctnm1)
August 20, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOSHUA A. MAZER. (Tucker, Caroline)
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MURIEL E. BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT filed by JOSHUA A. MAZER.(Tucker, Caroline)
August 12, 2021 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss by JOSHUA A. MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucker, Caroline)
August 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition and reply due by 8/20/2021. Defendants' reply due by 8/27/2021. (hmc)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. On or before August 20, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a combined Opposition to Defendants' #20 Motion to Dismiss and Reply supporting his #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall submit any reply brief by August 27, 2021. The parties are directed to Paragraph 9(A) of the Court's #3 Standing Order, which states that motions for extension of time "must be filed at least four business days prior to the first affected deadline." Future requests that do not comply with this requirement may be denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/12/2021. (lctnm1)
August 12, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; emailed to ctucker@sirillp.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match login/password for all future fillings. (zeg, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 22 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE. (eg)
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #21 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The Clerk of the Court shall docket ECF No. 21-1 as an Amicus Curiae Brief. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/2021. (lctnm1)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On or before August 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a combined Opposition to Defendant's #20 Motion to Dismiss and Reply supporting his #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall submit any reply brief by August 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/3/2021. (lctnm1)
August 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition due by 8/13/2021. Defendants' reply due by 8/20/2021. (hmc)
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by MURIEL E. BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Table of State Laws 1971)(Saindon, Andrew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MURIEL E. BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Wiest on behalf of JOSHUA A. MAZER (Wiest, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LAQUANDRA NESBITT served on 7/12/2021 (Tucker, Caroline)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH served on 7/12/2021 (Tucker, Caroline)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 07/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Declaration of Service, #2 Exhibit "B" to Declaration of Service)(Garza, John)
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Wiest, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8612444. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSHUA A. MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Garza, John)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Wiest is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/20/2021. (lctnm1)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of JOSHUA A. MAZER (Brehm, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Siri on behalf of JOSHUA A. MAZER (Siri, Aaron)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline V Tucker on behalf of JOSHUA A. MAZER (Tucker, Caroline)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caroline Tucker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8593856. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSHUA A MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of All Defendants (Saindon, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response due by 7/30/2021. (zhmc)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before July 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/13/2021. (lctnm1)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Caroline Tucker is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/13/2021. (lctnm1)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MURIEL BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Disney, Pamela)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Disney on behalf of All Defendants (Disney, Pamela)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. Brehm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8593549. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSHUA A MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, John)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Siri, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8593539. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSHUA A MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, John)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth A. Brehm is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/12/2021. (lctnm1)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Aaron Siri is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/12/2021. (lctnm1)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOSHUA A MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Garza, John)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/6/2021. (lctnm1)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MURIEL BOWSER, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, LAQUANDRA NESBITT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8576092) filed by JOSHUA A MAZER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - D.C. Health Department, #3 Summons - Nesbitt_Director of D.C. Health Department, #4 Summons - Bowser_Mayor of D.C.)(Garza, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZER v. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MURIEL BOWSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LAQUANDRA NESBITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA A MAZER
Represented By: John R. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA A. MAZER
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Caroline V Tucker
Represented By: Christopher D Wiest
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Represented By: John R. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?