KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, U.S. Borax Inc. and Rio Tinto Energy America Inc.
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv01835
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Reinhart, Tara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Kennecott Utah Copper LLC, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-01835-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Arteaga, Juan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 19 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Kennecott Utah Copper LLC, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-01835-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric)
August 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Childress, Tyrone)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Bryan on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Bryan, Kelsey)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Majoras, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone R. Childress on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Childress, Tyrone)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021 by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., U.S. BORAX INC. . (Kasuboski, Courtney) Modified docket event/text on 7/16/2021 (eg).
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
July 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., U.S. BORAX INC. re #1 Complaint, filed by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC.. (Kasuboski, Courtney)
July 12, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to courtneykasuboski@quinnemanuel.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-mc-00008. (Kasuboski, Courtney)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc. (Kasuboski, Courtney)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8588190) filed by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kasuboski, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenecott Utah Copper LLC
Represented By: Courtney Kasuboski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Borax Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Kasuboski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Tinto Energy America Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Kasuboski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Juan Arteaga
Represented By: Eric Fanchiang
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Luke P. van Houwelingen
Represented By: Mara Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Tyrone R. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?