BOOTH et al v. BOWSER et al
Plaintiff: Victor Booth, Shameka Williams, Shanita Williams, Jane Hellewell and VICTOR M. BOOTH
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER, LAQUANDRA NESBITT and LEWIS FEREBEE
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01857
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolf Hazlehurst on behalf of VICTOR M. BOOTH (Hazlehurst, Rolf)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2021. Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, DENIED without prejudice. Defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss, GRANTED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2021. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne.) (hmc) Modified on 9/2/2021 (hmc).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K Kamakawiwoole, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kamakawiwoole, Peter)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice re Possible Consolidation under Rule 65(a)(2). Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/28/2021 (lctnm1)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Disney on behalf of All Defendants (Disney, Pamela)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mateya Beth Kelley on behalf of All Defendants (Kelley, Mateya)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Saindon, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a Telephonic Hearing on the parties' motions at 11:00 a.m. on September 2, 2021. Dial-in details will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/25/2021. (lctnm1)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE. (eg)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #18 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The Clerk of the Court shall docket ECF No. 18-1 as an Amicus Curiae Brief. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/13/2021. (lctnm1)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by MURIEL E. BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Table of State Laws 1971, #3 Exhibit DC Universal Health Certificate)(Saindon, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MURIEL E. BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Table of State Laws 1971, #3 Exhibit DC Universal Health Certificate)(Saindon, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rolf G. S. Hazlehurst, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8640922. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rolf G. S. Hazlehurst, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8640897. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., #2 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rolf G. S. Hazlehurst is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/2021. (lctnm1)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert F. Kennedy, Jr. is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/2021. (lctnm1)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter K. Kamakawiwoole is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/2021. (lctnm1)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter K. Kamakawiwoole, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8619307. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support)(Mason, James)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Email)(Mason, James)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Complaint due by 8/5/2021. Plaintiff's response due by 8/19/2021. Defendants' reply due by 8/25/2021. (hmc)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/16/2021. (lctnm1)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden as there is an earlier related case. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Establish a Briefing Schedule by MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saindon, Andrew) Modified event on 7/19/2021 (znmw).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #9 Joint Motion to Establish a Briefing Schedule. On or before August 5, 2021, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall respond to any motion to dismiss by August 19, 2021. Defendants shall file their reply brief, if any, by August 25, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/16/2021. (lctnm1)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, Report on Progress by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ERRATA Index of Attachments by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by VICTOR M. BOOTH, SHANITA WILLIAMS, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS. (Mason, James)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ERRATA Index of Attachments by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint,,, filed by VICTOR M. BOOTH, SHANITA WILLIAMS, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS. (Mason, James)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 14, 2021. (lcbah1)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiffs to submit to Chambers, by July 15, 2021, printed courtesy copies of their #1 Complaint, along with its exhibits and attachments, and their #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, along with its attachments, and to file on the docket an index of the exhibits attached to their #1 Complaint, in compliance with the #5 Standing Order para. 5(a)-(b); and further DIRECTING plaintiffs to confer with opposing counsel regarding a proposed schedule to address the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to submit to the Court, by July 15, 2021, at 12:00 PM, a joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 14, 2021. (lcbah1)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by 12:00 PM on 7/15/2021. (ztg)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ERRATA Verified Complaint by VICTOR M. BOOTH, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS, SHANITA WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint,,, filed by VICTOR M. BOOTH, SHANITA WILLIAMS, JANE HELLEWELL, SHAMEKA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jim@hslda.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Victor Booth, Jane Hellewell, Shameka Williams, Shanita Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mason, James)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, LAQUANDRA NESBITT in their official capacities, Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8593216) filed by Jane Hellewell, Victor Booth, Shanita Williams, Shameka Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Vaccine Information Statements, #4 Exhibit B - Vaccine Injury Data & Statistics, #5 Exhibit C - Vaccine Injury Table, #6 Exhibit D - Vaccine Contraindications and Precautions, #7 Exhibit E - ACIP Immunization Schedules, #8 Exhibit F - Covid-19 Vaccine Fact Sheet, #9 Summons Mayor Muriel Bowser, Defendant, #10 Summons Director LaQuandra Nesbitt, Defendant, #11 Summons Chancellor Lewis Ferebee, Defendant)(Mason, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOOTH et al v. BOWSER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Booth
Represented By: James R. Mason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Williams
Represented By: James R. Mason, III
Represented By: Rolf Hazlehurst,
Represented By: Peter K Kamakawiwoole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanita Williams
Represented By: James R. Mason, III
Represented By: Rolf Hazlehurst,
Represented By: Peter K Kamakawiwoole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Hellewell
Represented By: James R. Mason, III
Represented By: Rolf Hazlehurst,
Represented By: Peter K Kamakawiwoole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR M. BOOTH
Represented By: Rolf Hazlehurst
Represented By: Peter K Kamakawiwoole, Jr
Represented By: James R. Mason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Mateya Beth Kelley
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAQUANDRA NESBITT
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Mateya Beth Kelley
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS FEREBEE
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Mateya Beth Kelley
Represented By: Pamela A. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: D.C. CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?