WILLIAMS v. COMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. WILLIAMS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv02005
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/12/2021. (znmg)
August 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (znmg)
July 26, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to clifff@ix.netcom.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. New cases with IFP should not be filed electronically. They must be emailed to: DCDml_Intake@DCD.USCOURTS.GOV, 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
July 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Unassigned. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (znmg)
July 26, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmg) Modified on 7/26/2021 (znmg).
July 23, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/23/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmg)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BARBARA A. WILLIAMS. (Farrell, Clifford)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by BARBARA A. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. COMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?