JW & ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND (SAFETY), LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and JW & Associates of Lakeland (Safety), LLC
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02177
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021 (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021 (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021 (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021 (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021 (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Reese John Henderson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henderson, Reese)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Reese J. Henderson, Jr. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/31/2021. (lcapm1)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JW & ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND (SAFETY), LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by JW & ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND (SAFETY), LLC, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Gorokhov, Eugene)
August 18, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to eugene@burnhamgorokhov.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reese J. Henderson, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8670349. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JW & Associates of Lakeland (Safety), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reese J. Henderson, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gorokhov, Eugene)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JW & Associates of Lakeland (Safety), LLC (Gorokhov, Eugene)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8670303) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JW & Associates of Lakeland (Safety), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Gorokhov, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JW & ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND (SAFETY), LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Eugene V. Gorokhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JW & Associates of Lakeland (Safety), LLC
Represented By: Eugene V. Gorokhov
Represented By: Reese John Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?