FRENKEL v. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRENKEL
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02326
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, with prejudice, pursuant to the parties' #16 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 29, 2021. (lcbah2)
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERT FRENKEL. (eg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY filed by ROBERT FRENKEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Redline Amended Complaint)(eg)
October 9, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by ROBERT FRENKEL. (eg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Baron on behalf of All Defendants (Baron, Stephanie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie K. Baron, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8778604. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephanie K. Baron. Ms. Baron may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendant in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on Octo ber 4, 2021. (lcbah2)
September 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by 10/11/2021. (ztg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's counsel #8 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Robert Frenkel. The motion is "accompanied by a certificate of service listing the party's last known address and stating that the attorney has served upon the party a copy of the motion and a notice advising the party to obtain other counsel," and the plaintiff has filed no objection with the Clerk in the intervening seven days since the motion was filed. See LCvR 83.6(c). It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing by October 11, 2021 whether he has obtained other counsel and/or intends to proceed pro se. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 21, 2021. (lcbah2)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by ROBERT FRENKEL re Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Meier, Jackie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Receipt on 9/17/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 003038 B. (eg)
September 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by 9/20/2021. (ztg)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff's current counsel, upon consideration of #8 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Robert Frenkel, to notify the Court by September 20, 2021 whether plaintiff intends to retain new counsel or proceed pro se. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 16, 2021. (lcbah2)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ROBERT FRENKEL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meier, Jackie)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 10, 2021. (lcbah2)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY (Pontone, Kathleen)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Pontone on behalf of GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY (Pontone, Kathleen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
September 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Removal by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY re Notice of QC- New Case,, Notice of Corrected Docket Entry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Notice of Removal by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY re Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/2/2021) (zsb). Modified on 9/2/2021 (zsb).
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 003038 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8707390 filed by The George Washington University. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
September 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to shodgewren@milesstockbridge.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
September 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Errata was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zsb)
September 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Errata; emailed to shodgewren@milesstockbridge.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. Document must be filed using the account of the signing attorney., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRENKEL v. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRENKEL
Represented By: Jackie Taylor Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Sasha E. Hodge-Wren
Represented By: Kathleen Pontone
Represented By: Stephanie Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?