FIORITO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S. FIORITO
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Director MICHAEL CARVAJAL, IAN CONNOR, BREWER, JOHN & JANE DOE and BOP GENERAL COUNSEL DOE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02341
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-03152. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 2, 2021 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC District of Columbia. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman terminated from case. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the District of Columbia for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/1/2021. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Submission of #2 , #6 , 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Compel, #5 , #17 MOTION to Expedite, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aar) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to #21 Order Transferring Pro Se Case, Sent to Court via extraction. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Georgia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/2/2021.. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 7/12/2021. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Compel. (See Docket entry #19 for document.) by MICHAEL S. FIORITO. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #18 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by MICHAEL S. FIORITO. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/25/2021. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02679. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to take action on Complaint and request for TRO by MICHAEL S. FIORITO. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
February 8, 2021 NOTICE that the case has been transferred to the District of Columbia. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Transfer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff Michael Fiorito's motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia #14 is GRANTED. 2. This action is TRANSFERRED back to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia for further proceedings. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/3/2021. (CLG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING THIS CASE BE TRANSFERRED BACK TO THE APPROPRIATE VENUE filed by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 2/11/2021 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER from Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Doty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-02679 PJS/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge David S. Doty on 1/12/2021.(MTP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Fiorito. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 1/14/2021 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-2679 DSD/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/4/2021.(MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-03350. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Prisoner List. [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Minnesota. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/29/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/09/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Service by MICHAEL S. FIORITO (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MICHAEL S. FIORITO (Attachment: #1 Memorandum in Support)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by MICHAEL S. FIORITO.. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. FIORITO (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by MICHAEL S. FIORITO.(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/17/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/29/2020.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/3/2021.] [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2021.] [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 9/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIORITO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S. FIORITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN & JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP GENERAL COUNSEL DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?