CORETEX LIMITED et al v. PERDIEMCO, LLC
Plaintiff: CORETEX LIMITED and CORETEX USA, INC.
Defendant: PERDIEMCO, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02459
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to opposition to motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case (Public Version) filed by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Babayi Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Berquist, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 25 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PERDIEMCO, LLC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #2 Babayi Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order)(Berquist, James)
November 10, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case (Public Version) [Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Public Version)] filed by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Sacksteder in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #2 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M (Filed Under Seal), #15 Proposed Order (Denying Motion to Dismiss or Transfer))(Sacksteder, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 23 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #3 Declaration of Michael J. Sacksteder in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Proposed Order (Denying Motion to Dismiss or Transfer))(Miller, Geoffrey)
November 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 5/27/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2022. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 12/14/2021. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 12/14/2021. Status Conference set for 5/27/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (hs)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER:See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/9/2021. (lcrc2)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Miller, Geoffrey)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' #20 Joint Motion for an Extension of time to Meet and Confer pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3 is GRANTED. The parties' joint report is now due on or before November 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/3/2021. (lcrc2)
November 2, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer (LCvR 16.3) by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Geoffrey)
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case (Public Version) by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Babayi Declaration with Exhibit, #2 Jackson Declaration with Exhibits 1-4, #3 Proposed Order)(Berquist, James)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PERDIEMCO, LLC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #2 Babayi Declaration with Exhibit, #3 Jackson Declaration with Exhibits 1-4, #4 Proposed Order)(Berquist, James)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PERDIEMCO, LLC (Berquist, James)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand (Public Version) by PERDIEMCO, LLC.(Berquist, James)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PERDIEMCO, LLC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Answer to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Berquist, James)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before November 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/19/2021.(lcrc2) Modified on 10/19/2021 (lcrc2).
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald L. Jackson on behalf of PERDIEMCO, LLC (Jackson, Donald)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Donald L. Jackson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8781852. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Jackson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Berquist, James)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Miller on behalf of CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC. (Miller, Geoffrey)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Donald L. Jackson is admitted to represent Defendant PerDiemCo, LLC pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/05/2021. (lcrc2)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Sacksteder on behalf of CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC. (Sacksteder, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Berquist on behalf of PERDIEMCO, LLC (Berquist, James)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Geoffrey R. Miller, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8768125. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey R. Miller in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 [Proposed] Order of Admission of Geoffrey R. Miller Pro Hac Vice)(Mehta, Sapna)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Sacksteder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8768097. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Sacksteder in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 [Proposed] Order of Admission of Michael J. Sacksteder Pro Hac Vice)(Mehta, Sapna)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PERDIEMCO, LLC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021 (Mehta, Sapna)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 #9 Unopposed Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Michael J. Sacksteder and Geoffrey R. Miller are admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. SO ORDERED. Signe d by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/29/2021. (lcrc2)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PERDIEMCO, LLC. (ztth) (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against PERDIEMCO, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 200) with Jury Demand filed by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ztth)
September 24, 2021 ***Case Unsealed. (ztth)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PERDIEMCO, LLC. (ztth)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CORETEX LIMITED, CORETEX USA, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORETEX LIMITED et al v. PERDIEMCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORETEX LIMITED
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Represented By: Geoffrey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORETEX USA, INC.
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Represented By: Geoffrey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERDIEMCO, LLC
Represented By: James Daniel Berquist
Represented By: Donald L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?