LANGAN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: DONNA LANGAN and PETER KEVIN LANGAN
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, ELIZABETH STAHL, IAN CONNORS, J. Doe 1, TCCT MEMBERS J. DOES 2-11, TEC MEMBERS J. DOES 12-21, ALISON LEUKEFELD, SHANNON ROBBINS, DON LEWIS and JENNIFER EPPLIN
Case Number: 1:2021cv02524
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/20/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/20/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2022.) (Green, Remy)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL CARVAJAL served on 10/28/2021; IAN CONNORS served on 10/28/2021; FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 10/28/2021 (Green, Remy) Modified serve date on 11/10/2021 (eg).
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL CARVAJAL, IAN CONNORS, JENNIFER EPPLIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, ALISON LEUKEFELD, DON LEWIS, SHANNON ROBBINS, ELIZABETH STAHL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(eg)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, Notice of QC filed by DONNA LANGAN. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by DONNA LANGAN, Notice of QC.(Green, Remy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Moira Meltzer-Cohen on behalf of DONNA LANGAN (Meltzer-Cohen, Moira)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(eg)
October 8, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #8 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to remy@femmelaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile. You must provide one summons for each individual defendant. (zeg, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of QC- New Case,, #1 Complaint filed by DONNA LANGAN. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,, #1 Complaint filed by DONNA LANGAN.(Green, Remy)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Remy Green on behalf of DONNA LANGAN (Green, Remy)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 5, 2021. (lcdlf3)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Motion to Issue Summons; emailed to chris@chrisleibiglaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 5, 2021. (lcdlf3)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Remy Green, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8773567. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONNA LANGAN. (Leibig, Christopher)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Moira Meltzer-Cohen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8773540. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONNA LANGAN. (Leibig, Christopher)
September 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA (correcting documents per docket notice) by DONNA LANGAN re #1 Complaint filed by DONNA LANGAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (corrected per docket notice))(Leibig, Christopher)
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to chris@chrisleibiglaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Civil Cover Sheet: attorney is not barred. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an e-signature., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Motion to Issue Summons; emailed to chris@chrisleibiglaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed MOTION to Issue Summons (proposed summons attached) by DONNA LANGAN. (Leibig, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8764439) filed by DONNA LANGAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leibig, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANGAN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA LANGAN
Represented By: Christopher R. K. Leibig
Represented By: Moira Meltzer-Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER KEVIN LANGAN
Represented By: Moira Meltzer-Cohen
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Christopher R. K. Leibig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH STAHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCCT MEMBERS J. DOES 2-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEC MEMBERS J. DOES 12-21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISON LEUKEFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER EPPLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?