ARIAS v. UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Plaintiff: Steven Leonel Arias
Defendant: UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Case Number: 1:2021cv02551
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/16/2021. (lcapm2)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #11 Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents was entered in error as a duplicate to Docket Entry #10 .(zeg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Receipt on 10/07/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 002979 B. (zjf)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Receipt on 10/7/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 002979 B. (eg) Modified on 10/29/2021 (zeg).
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jan Oppenheim on behalf of UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP (Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's response to the Complaint shall now be due on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on October 4, 2021. (lcapm2)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP . (Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re: #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP filed by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP.(Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP filed by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP.(Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Removal by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP re Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to matt@oandzlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
October 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Cover Sheet; emailed to matt@oandzlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
October 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP (Oppenheim, Matthew)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, Civil Division, case number 2021 CA 002979 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8772742 filed by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Oppenheim, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIAS v. UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Leonel Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
Represented By: Matthew Jan Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?